Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973430

EP0973430 - ENDOSCOPE WITH LENGTH CORRECTION DURING THERMAL STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  13.07.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2007Opposition rejectedpublished on 15.08.2007  [2007/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RUDISCHHAUSER, Jürgen
Egerstrasse 24
D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE
02 / RENNER, Klaus
Heudorfer Strasse 10
D-78576 Liptingen / DE
03 / HÖFIG, Siegfried
Scheffelstrasse 26
D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Weller, Wolfgang , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Weller, Wolfgang, Dr. , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 105462
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98921403.627.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01826
Priority number, dateDE199711327529.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19713275
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843529
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973430
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973430
Date:14.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, A61B1/04
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:ENDOSKOP MIT LÄNGENAUSGLEICH BEI THERMISCHER BELASTUNG[2000/04]
English:ENDOSCOPE WITH LENGTH CORRECTION DURING THERMAL STRESS[2000/04]
French:ENDOSCOPE AVEC COMPENSATION DE LONGUEUR EN CAS DE CHARGE THERMIQUE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase28.10.1999National basic fee paid 
28.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
28.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.2004Fee for grant paid
05.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.04.2005  21.04.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Henke-Sass Wolf GmbH
Kronenstrasse 16
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/23]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.2005  21.04.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Henke-Sass Wolf GmbH
Kronenstrasse 16
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian
Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
20.05.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.11.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/33]
17.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.03.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9605764  (IMAGYN MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 31 * * page 15, line 3 - page 16, line 4; figures 1,4,10,11 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]DE3708124  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 67 - column 7, line 51; figure 1 *