Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975678

EP0975678 - METHOD FOR POLYMERIZING ALPHA-OLEFINS IN A GASEOUS PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]METHOD FOR POLYMERIZING $g(a)-OLEFINS IN A GASEOUS PHASE
[2000/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/22]For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse
50389 Wesseling / DE
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MIHAN, Shahram
Rossinistrasse 12
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / LANGE, Armin
Furtwänglerstrasse 7
D-69121 Heidelberg / DE
03 / ROSENDORFER, Philipp
Karolinenstrasse 50
D-67434 Neustadt / DE
04 / HACK, Johannes
Am Schmittengraben 8
D-67269 Grünstadt / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date98921422.602.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998EP01944
Priority number, dateDE199711623918.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19716239
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847928
Date:29.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975678
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975678
Date:02.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/44, C08F2/34, C08F10/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISATION VON ALPHA-OLEFINEN IN DER GASPHASE[2000/30]
English:METHOD FOR POLYMERIZING ALPHA-OLEFINS IN A GASEOUS PHASE[2000/30]
French:PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION D'ALPHA-OLEFINES EN PHASE GAZEUSE[2000/30]
Former [2000/05]VERFAHREN ZUR POLYMERISATION VON $g(a)-OLEFINEN IN DER GASPHASE
Former [2000/05]METHOD FOR POLYMERIZING $g(a)-OLEFINS IN A GASEOUS PHASE
Former [2000/05]PROCEDE DE POLYMERISATION D'$g(a)-OLEFINES EN PHASE GAZEUSE
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
27.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2002Fee for grant paid
08.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipPT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
[2004/22]
Former [2003/29]PT02.01.2003
SE02.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE02.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5391657  (SONG GYUNG-HO [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6-10 * abstract * * examples 4-8 * * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]WO8802379  (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10 * page 7, line 15 - line 18 * * examples 1,12 * * claims 1,7 *