Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980593

EP0980593 - TERMINAL CLAMP FOR CONNECTING AN ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2002  [2002/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NKT Cables GmbH
Schanzenstrasse 24
51063 Köln / DE
[2001/33]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Felten & Guilleaume AG
Schanzenstrasse 24-30
51063 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUNSELMEYER, Michael
Moorhausener Weg 21
D-26316 Varel / DE
02 / DEUSSER, Peter
Rintelner Strasse 18
D-26954 Nordenham / DE
03 / KUNZ, Andreas
Friedrichstrasse 1
D-26919 Brake / DE
04 / OSTERWOHLDT, Karl, Heinz
Seedorffstrasse 1
D-26954 Nordenham / DE
05 / STORZER, Hans-Dieter
Am Butjenter 1
26954 Nordenham / DE
06 / FÖRST, Bernd
Bussardstrasse 25
26349 Jaderberg / DE
[2000/08]
Application number, filing date98921468.918.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998EP02302
Priority number, dateDE199712004514.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19720045
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9852249
Date:19.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980593
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/36, H01R4/30
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ANSCHLUSSKLEMME ZUM ANSCHLUSS EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LEITERS[2000/08]
English:TERMINAL CLAMP FOR CONNECTING AN ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR[2000/08]
French:BORNE DE CONNEXION POUR CONDUCTEUR ELECTRIQUE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
14.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
17.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2001Fee for grant paid
07.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/10]
12.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4735586  (HALLER BERND [DE]) [X] 9 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 16 * [A] 10;
 [YA]US4589722  (HALL HOLLAND [CA], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 22 * [A] 2-4,6-8;
 [YA]US3742431  (KOBYNER H) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 4, line 35 * [A] 5;
 [A]DE2141348  (PFISTERER ELEKTROTECH KARL) [A] 11-14 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *