blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1003518

EP1003518 - A METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF MENTAL ILLNESS IN MAMMALS AND A COMPOSITION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2010
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORION CORPORATION
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
[2007/17]
Former [2005/45]For all designated states
Orion Corporation
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Orion Corporation
Orionintie 1
02200 Espoo / FI
For all designated states
Oy Juvantia Pharma Ltd
Lemminkäisenkatu 5, Pharmacity
20520 Turku / FI
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Haapalinna, Antti
Hellaksenkatu 4 D 5
20360 Turku / FI
For all designated states
Viitamaa, Timo
Kähärintie 2
20300 Turku / FI
For all designated states
Sallinen, Jukka
Puutarhakatu 29 A 3
20100 Turku / FI
For all designated states
Scheinin, Mika
Mannerheiminkatu 23
21100 Naantali / FI
For all designated states
Savola, Juha-Matti
Siutlankatu 8
20380 Turku / FI
Inventor(s)01 / HAAPALINNA, Antti
Markulantie 8 A
20360 Turku / FI
02 / SCHEININ, Mika
Mannerheiminkatu 23
21100 Naantali / FI
03 / VIITAMAA, Timo
Kähärintie 2
20300 Turku / FI
04 / SAVOLA, Juha-Matti
Suitlankatu 8
20380 Turku / FI
05 / SALLINEN, Jukka
Puutarhakatu 29 A
20100 Turku / FI
 [2004/34]
Former [2000/22]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB
Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2000/22]Winter, Brandl & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date98921508.211.05.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998FI00398
Priority number, dateUS1997085473012.05.1997         Original published format: US 854730
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9851310
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003518
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE19.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/505, A61K31/55, A61K45/00
[2000/22]
CPC:
A61K45/06 (EP,US); A61K31/4164 (EP,US); A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP); A61P25/24 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
Extension statesLT10.12.1999
LV10.12.1999
RO10.12.1999
SI10.12.1999
TitleGerman:METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEISTESKRANKHEITEN BEI SÄUGERN[2000/22]
English:A METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF MENTAL ILLNESS IN MAMMALS AND A COMPOSITION THEREFOR[2000/22]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIE MENTALE CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES ET COMPOSITION A CET EFFET[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase10.12.1999National basic fee paid 
10.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
24.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
14.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
19.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/37]
25.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0730865  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP])
 [X]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 125:212567, BLIN OLIVIER et al., "Antipsychotic and Anxiolytic Properties of Risperidone, Haloperidol and Methotrimeprazine in Schizophrenic Patients"; & J. CLIN. PSYCHOPHARMACOL., (1996), 16(1), 38-44.
 [X]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 76:196, ANGST J. et al., "Double Blind Study with HF 1854 [8-Chloro-11-(4-Methyl-1-Piperazinyl)-5H-Di benzoab,Eaal,4Adiazepine] in Comparison with Levomepromazine"; & PHARMAKOPSYCHIAT./NEURO-PSYCHOPHARMAKOL., (1971), 4(4), 192-200.
 [XP]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File MEDLINE, MEDLINE Accession No. 98195368, SALLINEN J. et al., "Adrenergic alpha2C-Receptors Modulate the Acoustic Startle Reflex, Prepulse Inhibition and Aggression in Mice"; & JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (15 April 1998), 18(8), 3035-42.
 [XP]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 127:326404, SPIVAK BARUCH et al., "Reduction of Aggressiveness and Impulsiveness During Clozapine Treatment in Chronic Neuroleptic-Resistant Schizophrenic Patients"; & CLIN. NEUROPHARMACOL., (1997), 20(5), 442-446.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.