Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991360

EP0991360 - BONE RECOVERING SURGICAL DRILL COMPRISING A COLOURED MARK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2005  [2005/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Implants Diffusion
15, boulevard Davout
75020 Paris / FR
[2002/35]
Former [2002/28]For all designated states
Societe Implants Diffusion
15, boulevard Davout
75020 Paris / FR
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Societe Implants Diffusion
59, rue Pixerecourt
75020 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOUKHRIS, Gilles
46, boulevard de Reuilly
F-75012 Paris / FR
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98921540.515.04.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998FR00760
Priority number, dateFR1997000538730.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9705387
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848708
Date:05.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991360
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991360
Date:31.03.2004
Language:FR
[2004/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/16
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE BOHRMASCHINE MIT AUFSAMMELVORRICHTUNG FÜR KNOCHENSUBSTANZ[2000/15]
English:BONE RECOVERING SURGICAL DRILL COMPRISING A COLOURED MARK[2000/15]
French:FORET CHIRURGICAL RECUPERATEUR D'OS COMPORTANT UNE BUTEE A REPERE EN COULEUR[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
21.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2003Fee for grant paid
02.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US5261818  (SHAW LEON [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9612453  (SMITH & NEPHEW DYONICS [US]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 31 - page 15, line 4; figure 4; claim 5 *;
 [A]US5575650  (NIZNICK GERALD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US4710075  (DAVISON DALE [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 36; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0515274  (PELTIER PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9324061  (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,4 *