blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975450

EP0975450 - METHOD FOR MAKING WING-SHAPED PARTS AND RESULTING PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALLOUREC COMPOSANTS AUTOMOBILES VITRY
Zone Industrielle Vitry-Marolles
51301 Vitry-le-Francois / FR
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / VALIN, Daniel
11, rue du Bas Pré
F-51300 Saint-Amand-sur-Fion / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Pellicani, Félix Angelo
Vallourec & Mannesman Tubes
Division Propriété Industrielle
27 Avenue du Général Leclerc
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Pellicani, Félix Angelo
SETVAL Division Propriété Industrielle 130 rue de Silly
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2000/05]Desolneux, Jean-Paul Charles
Setval Division Propriété Industrielle 130, rue de Silly
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Application number, filing date98921548.816.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998FR00769
Priority number, dateFR1997000517718.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9705177
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9847644
Date:29.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975450
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975450
Date:03.09.2003
Language:FR
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:B21D53/88
[2000/05]
CPC:
B60B35/08 (EP,US); B21D53/00 (EP,US); B21D53/88 (EP,US);
B23P15/00 (EP,US); B60G21/051 (EP,US); B62D25/00 (EP,US);
B23P2700/14 (EP,US); B60G2202/135 (EP,US); B60G2202/136 (EP,US);
B60G2206/012 (EP,US); B60G2206/20 (EP,US); B60G2206/202 (EP,US);
B60G2206/42 (EP,US); B60G2206/60 (EP,US); B60G2206/81 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8103 (EP,US); Y10T29/49291 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜGELFÖRMIGEN WERKSTÜCKEN UND MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE WERKSTÜCKE[2000/05]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING WING-SHAPED PARTS AND RESULTING PARTS[2000/05]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PIECES EN FORME D'AILES ET PIECES RESULTANT DU PROCEDE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
19.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2003Fee for grant paid
20.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB03.09.2003
IT03.09.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/45]GB03.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US3181336  (PERCIVAL SCHOFIELD HUBERT) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3335912  (REICHE & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4088001  (ISHIKAWA MASAKAZU, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE1813978  (MANCO MFG CO) [A] 1 * page 17, paragraph L *;
 [DA]FR2734207  (VALLOUREC VITRY [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]FR2737177  (VALLOUREC VITRY [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]FR2392838  (LEAR SIEGLER INC [US]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]GB2197051  (CASTELLON MELCHOR DUAMAL) [DA] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.