Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009512

EP1009512 - FILTER AND FILTERING CARTRIDGE WITH FLEXIBLE FLANGE FOR FILTERING LIQUIDS CIRCULATING IN AN ENGINE OR IN A HYDRAULIC EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLEETGUARD
Z.I. du Grand Guélen
29556 Quimper Cédex 9 / FR
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / GUICHAOUA, Jean-Luc
Perien Bonis
F-29120 Combrit / FR
02 / AUFFRET, Guy
Rue de l'Odet
F-29510 Langolen / FR
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Vidon, Patrice
Cabinet Vidon
Technopole Atalante
16B Rue de Jouanet
BP 90333
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Vidon, Patrice
Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes
35700 Rennes / FR
Application number, filing date98921564.517.04.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998FR00787
Priority number, dateFR1997000504218.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9705042
[2000/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847598
Date:29.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009512
Date:21.06.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009512
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01D35/30, B01D35/153
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/25]
TitleGerman:FILTER UND FILTERKARTUSCHE MIT FLEXIBLEM FLANSCH FÜR DIE FILTRATION VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN, DIE IN EINEM MOTOR ODER EINER HYDRAULIK ZIRKULIEREN[2000/25]
English:FILTER AND FILTERING CARTRIDGE WITH FLEXIBLE FLANGE FOR FILTERING LIQUIDS CIRCULATING IN AN ENGINE OR IN A HYDRAULIC EQUIPMENT[2000/25]
French:FILTRE ET CARTOUCHE DE FILTRAGE A FLASQUE FLEXIBLE POUR LE FILTRAGE DE LIQUIDES CIRCULANT DANS UN MOTEUR OU DANS UN EQUIPEMENT HYDRAULIQUE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1999National basic fee paid 
12.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/25]
26.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2002Fee for grant paid
17.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.09.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2004/04]ES28.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]GB789280  (GEN MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4428771  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9220425  (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [AD]FR2715080  (FLEETGUARD INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *