Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978150

EP0978150 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL BASED ON TITANIUM OXYSULPHIDE FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL GENERATOR AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2002
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Centre National De La Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE
3 rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cédex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MEUNIER, Georges
12, chemin Péguileyre
F-33650 Saint Médard d'Erans / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)des Termes, Monique , et al
Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Des Termes, Monique , et al
Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98921576.921.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998FR00799
Priority number, dateFR1997000496022.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9704960
[2000/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848467
Date:29.10.1998
Language:FR
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978150
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978150
Date:05.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/58
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:POSITIVES ELEKTRODENMATERIAL AUF BASIS VON TITANOXYSULFID FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN GENERATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/06]
English:POSITIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL BASED ON TITANIUM OXYSULPHIDE FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL GENERATOR AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME[2000/06]
French:MATERIAU D'ELECTRODE POSITIVE A BASE D'OXYSULFURE DE TITANE POUR GENERATEUR ELECTROCHIMIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
23.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2001Fee for grant paid
19.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200003   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK05.12.2001
PT05.12.2001
GR07.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
MC21.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
[2005/01]
Former [2004/10]DK05.12.2001
PT05.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
MC21.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
Former [2004/04]DK05.12.2001
PT05.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
MC21.04.2002
Former [2003/46]DK05.12.2001
PT05.12.2001
MC21.04.2002
Former [2003/25]PT05.12.2001
MC21.04.2002
Former [2002/27]PT05.12.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9005387  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]US4934922  (ABRAHAM KUZHIKALAIL M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US4243624  (JACOBSON ALLAN J, et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]US4066824  (RAO BHASKARA M L, et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]US5147739  (BEARD KIRBY W [US]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-27 *
 [A]  - MEUNIER G ET AL, "NEW AMORPHOUS TITANIUM OXYSULFIDES OBTAINED IN THE FORM OF THIN FILMS", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19911201), vol. 205, no. 2, pages 213 - 217, XP000261323 [A] 1-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(91)90302-E
 [A]  - JONES S D ET AL, "Thin film rechargeable Li batteries", SOLID STATE IONICS, DIFFUSION & REACTIONS, AUG. 1994, NETHERLANDS, ISSN 0167-2738, vol. 69, no. 3-4, pages 357 - 368, XP002051779 [A] 1-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-2738(94)90423-5