Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0988307 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0988307



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1369
11.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
28.09.2007 Request for change of address Opposition 1
26.09.2007 Request for change of address Opposition 1
31.05.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
31.05.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.05.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
15.05.2007 General enquiry Opposition 1
20.02.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
16.02.2007 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
16.02.2007 French translation of claims Opposition 2
16.02.2007 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
14.02.2007 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 8
06.11.2006 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
06.11.2006 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
06.11.2006 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
06.11.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 11
19.10.2006 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
15.03.2006 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.01.2006 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
19.01.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 27
25.11.2005 Description Appeal 8
25.11.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 15
18.11.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.11.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
16.11.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.11.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.10.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 3
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 1
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 1
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
28.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
28.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
28.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
28.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.10.2005 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
27.10.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
24.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
24.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
24.10.2005 Claims Appeal 3
24.10.2005 Description Appeal 2
24.10.2005 Description Appeal 1
24.10.2005 Description Appeal 2
24.10.2005 Description Appeal 1
24.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
24.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
19.10.2005 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
15.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.10.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
13.10.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
12.08.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.08.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
02.08.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.07.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 14
26.07.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.03.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 26
08.02.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
08.02.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
08.02.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.02.2005 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
03.02.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 26
11.10.2004 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.09.2004 Abstract Appeal 1
30.09.2004 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 20
30.09.2004 Claims Appeal 3
30.09.2004 Claims Appeal 3
30.09.2004 Claims Appeal 3
30.09.2004 Claims Appeal 3
30.09.2004 Description Appeal 9
30.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
30.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
30.09.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.09.2004 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.09.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 80
23.09.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
03.08.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.07.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.07.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.05.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 20
18.05.2004 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
18.05.2004 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
18.05.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 22
18.05.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.03.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.03.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.03.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.03.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
27.02.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.02.2004 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 16
17.02.2004 Claims Opposition 3
17.02.2004 Claims Opposition 3
17.02.2004 Claims Opposition 3
17.02.2004 Claims Opposition 3
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 7
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 3
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 3
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 7
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 5
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 9
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 9
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 8
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 5
17.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 6
17.02.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
16.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.02.2004 Claims Opposition 12
16.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 82
16.02.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
13.02.2004 Claims Opposition 12
13.02.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 13
13.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
12.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
12.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 6
12.02.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 5
12.02.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
12.02.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 20
12.02.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 20
11.02.2004 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.02.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 20
29.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.12.2003 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2003 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.10.2003 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2003 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
10.10.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.10.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.04.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.03.2003 Claims Opposition 4
17.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.03.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
17.03.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
14.03.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 32
23.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.01.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.01.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.01.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
04.09.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.09.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.08.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 18
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 35
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 20
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.07.2002 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.07.2002 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.07.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
24.07.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 50
13.09.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
22.06.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.06.2001 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 9
16.03.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.03.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
01.03.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2000 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.10.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
15.09.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
04.04.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.03.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.03.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.03.2000 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.03.2000 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
23.03.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.01.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 4
11.01.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
10.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
10.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
12.08.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
05.07.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
23.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 28
10.11.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.11.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 27