blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0989993 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0989993



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 279
09.01.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.02.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.01.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
14.01.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 11
01.10.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.10.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
01.10.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
28.03.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
25.07.2006 Annex Search / examination 2
25.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
25.07.2006 Description Search / examination 16
25.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.07.2006 Description Search / examination 16
24.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.07.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.05.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
14.02.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
03.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 8
03.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
10.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.05.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
23.02.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.12.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.09.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
12.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.01.1999 Priority document Search / examination 46
17.12.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
17.12.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 46