blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0989993


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.01.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
01.02.2008 (Expected) grant published on  05.03.2008  [2008/10]
25.01.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.01.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.09.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.09.2007 Change - classification published on  24.10.2007  [2007/43]
21.09.2007 Change - classification published on  24.10.2007  [2007/43]
11.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2007 Change - representative published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
27.07.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.05.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2005 Change - representative published on  13.04.2005  [2005/15]
08.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.05.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.05.2004 First examination report
06.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.05.2003 Renewal fee
25.03.2002 Renewal fee
27.06.2001 Renewal fee
29.06.2000 Renewal fee
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
18.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
30.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.1999 Change - extension states
25.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication