blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0989993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3414759BGlobal Dossier 09.06.2003B2
JP2000514840 07.11.2000A
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0989993Global Dossier 05.03.2008B1
EP0989993 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU744775B 07.03.2002B2
AU7445598 04.01.1999A
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BG104024 31.07.2000A
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9810623 15.06.2010B1
BR9810623 25.07.2000A
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2294422 22.07.2003C
CA2294422 30.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69839211T 19.03.2009T2
DE69839211D 17.04.2008D1
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0989993T 02.06.2008T3
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA002643 29.08.2002B1
EA199901076 28.08.2000A1
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL132810D 19.03.2001D0
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL160676D 31.08.2004D0
Priority number Date
IL13281098 05.06.1998
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL160677D 31.08.2004D0
Priority number Date
IL13281098 05.06.1998
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL160678D 31.08.2004D0
Priority number Date
IL13281098 05.06.1998
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL160679D 31.08.2004D0
Priority number Date
IL13281098 05.06.1998
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IS5276 26.11.1999A
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO996469L 23.02.2000L
NO996469D 23.12.1999D0
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ500658 31.08.2001A
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL337654 28.08.2000A1
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SK177299 11.09.2001A3
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6248717 19.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
IB9800874 05.06.1998
US5072397 25.06.1997
US38088699 07.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6596867 22.07.2003B2
US2001016570 23.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
US38088699 07.09.1999
US73426900 11.12.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9858948Global Dossier 30.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AP1043 04.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR012255 27.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT388163T 15.03.2008T
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1314912 26.09.2001A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1524857 01.09.2004A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO4810383 30.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DZ2538 08.02.2003A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2301196T 16.06.2008T3
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GT199800085 10.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HRP980362 28.02.1999A2
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HU0002664 28.12.2001A3
HU0002664 28.12.2000A2
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID23188 23.03.2000A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100339936B 10.06.2002B1
KR20010014153 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MA26516 20.12.2004A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
OA11241 26.05.2003A
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PA8453401 24.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE97599 12.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT989993E 15.04.2008E
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TNSN98111 15.03.2005A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR199903261T 21.08.2000T2
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI221153B 21.09.2004B
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UY25059 29.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9805541 10.01.2000B
Priority number Date
US5072397 25.06.1997