Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989993

EP0989993 - TARTRATE SALT OF A SUBSTITUTED DIPEPTIDE AS GROWTH HORMONE SECRETAGOGUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.2009
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.02.2009  [2009/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[2008/10]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CARPINO, Philip, Albert
50 Meridian Street, No. 2
Groton, CT 06340 / US
02 / DASILVA-JARDINE, Paul, Andrew
89 Angell Street
Providence, RI 02906 / US
03 / LEFKER, Bruce, Allen
21 Eagle Ridge Drive
Gales Ferry, CT 06335 / US
04 / MURRY, Jerry, Anthony
404 Tater Hill Road
East Haddam, CT 06423 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine , et al
Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine , et al
Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2005/15]Vercaemer, Laurence
Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2000/14]Ruddock, Keith Stephen
Pfizer Limited, European Patent Department, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date98921681.705.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998IB00874
Priority number, dateUS19970050723P25.06.1997         Original published format: US 50723 P
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9858948
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0989993
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989993
Date:05.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07K5/02, A61K38/06, C07D401/06, C07D471/04
[2007/43]
Former International [2000/14]C07K5/023, A61K38/06, C07D401/06, C07D471/04, // (C07D471/04, 231:00), C07D221:00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesAL19.11.1999
LT19.11.1999
LV19.11.1999
MK19.11.1999
RO19.11.1999
SI19.11.1999
TitleGerman:DAS TARTRATSALZ EINES SUBSTITUIERTEN DIPEPTIDES ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER SEKRETION VON WACHSTUMSHORMON[2000/14]
English:TARTRATE SALT OF A SUBSTITUTED DIPEPTIDE AS GROWTH HORMONE SECRETAGOGUE[2000/14]
French:TARTRATE DE DIPEPTIDE SUBSTITUE INTERVENANT COMME SECRETAGOGUE D'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase19.11.1999National basic fee paid 
19.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
10.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2008Fee for grant paid
14.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9724369  (PFIZER [US], et al) [PX] 1-42 * page 30, line 15 - page 31, line 10 * * page 35, line 19 - line 26 * * page 113; examples 129,130; claim - *;
 [A]WO9513069  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9413696  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * example -; claim - *