Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991748

EP0991748 - NON-AQUEOUS, SPECKLE-CONTAINING LIQUID DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SMERZNAK, Mark, Allen
Apartment 4 107 Glenmary Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45220 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
IP Patent Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Engisch, Gautier , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe SPRL, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date98921691.608.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998IB00884
Priority number, dateUS19970051154P27.06.1997         Original published format: US 51154 P
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900477
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991748
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991748
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/40
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:WASSERFREIE FLÜSSIGE SPRENKEL ENTHALTENDE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2000/15]
English:NON-AQUEOUS, SPECKLE-CONTAINING LIQUID DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS[2000/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES LIQUIDES NON AQUEUSES RENFERMANT DES MOUCHETURES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase27.12.1999National basic fee paid 
27.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2003Fee for grant paid
22.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.10.2003
BE22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
PT22.03.2004
IE08.06.2004
LU08.06.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2005/24]AT22.10.2003
BE22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
IE08.06.2004
LU08.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT22.10.2003
BE22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
LU08.06.2004
Former [2004/52]AT22.10.2003
BE22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
Former [2004/46]AT22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
ES02.02.2004
Former [2004/41]AT22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT22.10.2003
CH22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
LI22.10.2003
NL22.10.2003
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT22.10.2003
FI22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE22.01.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0635569  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 3, column 36 - column 51; example -; claim - *;
 [A]GB2194793  (UNILEVER PLC) [A] 1-3 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]GB1303810  (UNILEVER) [A] 1 * page 2, line 40 - line 55; claims 1,18 *