Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020459

EP1020459 - CIS-DISUBSTITUTED AMINOCYCLOALKYL-PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
14-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
14-10, Nihonbashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEMURA, Makoto, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Tokyo R & D Center, 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome
Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0081 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Hisashi, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Tokyo R & D Center, 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome
Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0081 / JP
03 / SUGITA, Kazuyuki, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Tokyo R & D Center, 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome
Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0081 / JP
04 / OHKI, Hitoshi, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Tokyo R & D Center, 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome
Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0081 / JP
05 / MIYAUCHI, Satoru, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Tokyo R & D Center, 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome
Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0081 / JP
06 / MIYAUCHI, Rie, Daiichi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
Tokyo R & D Center, 16-13, Kita-Kasai 1-chome
Edogawa-ku, Tokyo 134-0081 / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date98921738.520.05.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998JP02219
Priority number, dateJP1997013141321.05.1997         Original published format: JP 13141397
JP1997014064329.05.1997         Original published format: JP 14064397
[2000/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9852939
Date:26.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020459
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020459
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, C07D471/04, C07D498/06, C07D207/09, A61K31/47, A61K31/535, A61P31/04
[2001/10]
Former International [2000/29]C07D401/04, C07D471/04, C07D498/06, C07D207/09, A61K31/47, A61K31/535
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:CIS-DISUBSTITUIERTE AMINOCYCLOALKYL-PYRROLIDIN-DERIVATE[2000/29]
English:CIS-DISUBSTITUTED AMINOCYCLOALKYL-PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVES[2000/29]
French:DERIVES D'AMINOCYCLOALKYLE-PYRROLIDINE CIS-DISUBSTITUES[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase18.11.1999Translation filed 
18.11.1999National basic fee paid 
18.11.1999Search fee paid 
18.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
18.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/29]
22.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2004Fee for grant paid
29.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
CY20.05.2005
IE20.05.2005
LU20.05.2005
MC31.05.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2007/29]
Former [2007/26]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
CY20.05.2005
IE20.05.2005
LU20.05.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2007/21]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
CY20.05.2005
IE20.05.2005
LU06.06.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2007/17]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
IE20.05.2005
LU06.06.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/25]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
IE20.05.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI06.04.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0347851  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [Y] 1-37 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]US5157128  (HAGEN SUSAN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-37 * example -; claim - *
International search[XP]WO9719072  (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al);
 [X]US5580872  (CHU DANIEL T [US], et al);
 [X]US5599816  (CHU DANIEL T [US], et al);
 [Y]WO9510519  (ABBOTT LAB [US]);
 [Y]JPH08277284  (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO);
 [Y]JPS62234082  (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO)