Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992240

EP0992240 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ERECTION FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2006  [2006/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOCHIDA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
7, Yotsuya 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-8515 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MOCHIDA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
7, Yotsuya 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8515 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOTSU, Tatsuto, Mochida Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
7, Yotsuya 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-8515 / JP
02 / OHZAWA, Nobuo, Mochida Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
7, Yotsuya 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-8515 / JP
03 / NAKAI, Yasuhiro, Mochida Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
7, Yotsuya 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160-8515 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98921878.929.05.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998JP02378
Priority number, dateUS1997000040229.05.1997         Original published format: US 402
JP1997034413429.11.1997         Original published format: JP 34413497
[2000/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9853819
Date:03.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992240
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/435, A61K31/12, A61K31/165, A61K31/235, A61K31/40, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, A61K31/505, A61K31/52, A61K38/08, A61K31/47
[2001/34]
Former International [2000/15]A61K31/435, A61K31/12, A61K31/165, A61K31/235, A61K31/40, A61K31/415, A61K31/44, A61K31/505, A61K31/52, A61K38/08, A61K45/00, C07D471/00, C07D471/04, C07D471/06, C07D471/14, C07D209/08, C07D209/88, C07D213/62, C07D213/72, C07D217/02, C07D217/24, C07D235/06, C07D235/08, C07D235/24, C07D239/34
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHES MITTEL BEI EREKTIONSSTOERUNGEN[2000/15]
English:THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ERECTION FAILURE[2000/15]
French:AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE DESTINE A TRAITER L'ANERECTION[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase29.11.1999Translation filed 
29.11.1999National basic fee paid 
29.11.1999Search fee paid 
29.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
29.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
02.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
29.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/30]
10.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9428902  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11,13-15 * page 2, lines 10-34; claims 1-11 *;
 [A]WO9528930  (PENTECH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11,13-15 * the whole document *;
 [PA]EP0812845  (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 9-11,13-15 * abstract *;
 [A]  TERRETT N K ET AL, "Sildenafil (VIAGRA), a potent and selective inhibitor of type 5 CGMP phosphodiesterase with utility for the treatment of male erectile dysfunction", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19960806), vol. 6, no. 15, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1819 - 1824, XP004135609 [A] 9-11,13-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(96)00323-X
International search[AP]WO9745427  (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al)