blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980573

EP0980573 - ULTRASONIC MEASURING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A. Hak Industrial Services B.V.
Utrechtsestraatweg 208
3911 TX Rhenen / NL
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DER HEIDE, Siemen, Roelof
Zonnebloemstraat 19A
NL-3051 SP Rotterdam / NL
[2000/08]
Representative(s)van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter
P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052
1000 HB Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date98921918.306.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998NL00253
Priority number, dateNL1997100600707.05.1997         Original published format: NL 1006007
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9850906
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980573
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980573
Date:07.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:G10K11/35, G10K11/00
[2000/08]
CPC:
G10K11/357 (EP,US); G10K11/002 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ULTRASCHALLMESSGERÄT[2000/08]
English:ULTRASONIC MEASURING INSTRUMENT[2000/08]
French:INSTRUMENT DE MESURE A ULTRASONS[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase28.10.1999National basic fee paid 
28.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
16.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2002Fee for grant paid
15.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.08.2002
BE07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
FI07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
SE07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
CY06.05.2003
IE06.05.2003
LU06.05.2003
[2005/21]
Former [2005/01]AT07.08.2002
BE07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
SE07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
CY06.05.2003
IE06.05.2003
LU06.05.2003
Former [2004/39]AT07.08.2002
BE07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
CY06.05.2003
IE06.05.2003
LU06.05.2003
Former [2004/36]AT07.08.2002
BE07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
CY06.05.2003
IE06.05.2003
Former [2004/29]AT07.08.2002
BE07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
IE06.05.2003
Former [2003/48]AT07.08.2002
BE07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
Former [2003/46]AT07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
DK07.11.2002
PT22.11.2002
Former [2003/31]AT07.08.2002
CH07.08.2002
GR07.08.2002
LI07.08.2002
PT22.11.2002
Former [2003/22]GR07.08.2002
PT22.11.2002
Former [2003/20]GR07.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS56165485  ;
 [A]US3504759  (CUBBERLY WALTER E JR) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2; claims 8,9 *;
 [DXAY]US4255798  (HAVIRA R MARK) [DX] 1 * column 4, line 45 - line 68; figure 19 * * column 11, line 56 - column 12, line 67 * * column 29, line 51 - line 68 * * column 30, line 19 - line 50 * [A] 4 [Y] 2;
 [A]US4361044  (KUPPERMAN DAVID S, et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 2 ** column 4, line 47 - line 57 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820407), vol. 006, no. 052, Database accession no. (E - 100), & JP56165485 A 19811219 (ALOKA CO LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.