Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017551

EP1017551 - A PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURING OF A DECORATIVE LAMINATE, A DECORATIVE LAMINATE OBTAINED BY THE PROCESS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Decorative Surfaces Holding AB
284 80 Perstorp / SE
[2001/13]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
PERSTORP AB
284 80 Perstorp / SE
Inventor(s)01 / PERSSON, Stefan
Ö Förstadsgatan 31
S-212 12 Malmö / SE
02 / RASMUSSON, Dennis
Sp rvägen 37
S-284 35 Perstorp / SE
03 / ANDERSSON, Thord
Spelvägen 7
S-284 37 Perstorp / SE
04 / SJÖSTEDT, Börje
Sälgliden 15
S-286 36 Örkelljunga / SE
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Larsson, Karin
Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]Larsson, Karin
Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/28]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98921962.104.05.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998SE00810
Priority number, dateSE1997000169106.05.1997         Original published format: SE 9701691
SE1997000391628.10.1997         Original published format: SE 9703916
[2000/28]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850207
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017551
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search reportSE12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B27N3/02, B27N3/06, B32B27/04, B32B29/00, B32B21/00, B44C5/04
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DEKORATIVEN LAMINATS, DURCH DAS VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES DEKORATIVES LAMINAT UND DESSEN NUTZUNG[2000/28]
English:A PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURING OF A DECORATIVE LAMINATE, A DECORATIVE LAMINATE OBTAINED BY THE PROCESS AND USE THEREOF[2000/28]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN STRATIFIE DECORATIF, STRATIFIE DECORATIF OBTENU PAR CE PROCEDE ET SON UTILISATION[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1998Translation filed 
05.11.1999National basic fee paid 
05.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
26.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
11.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/18]
Request for further processing for:23.12.2003Request for further processing filed
16.12.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.01.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200205   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1507841
 [Y]FR2609927
 [Y]SE506696
 [A]EP0122905
 [A]EP0329154