Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977738

EP0977738 - CYCLIN DEPENDENT KINASE (CDK)4 INHIBITORS AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT as represented by THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 325, 6011 Executive Boulevard
Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US
[2005/46]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
THE UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT as represented by THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Office of Technology Transfer, Suite 325, 6011 Executive Boulevard
Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KELLEY, Michael, J.
8200 Gallery Court
Montgomery Village, MD 20886 / US
02 / NAKAGAWA, Kazuhiko
1-12-9, Oonodai Osakasayama
Osaka 589 / JP
03 / DENT, Barry, Roy
1 Donald Crescent
Wellington 6005 / NZ
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/06]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date98922070.228.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US08602
Priority number, dateUS19970044256P28.04.1997         Original published format: US 44256 P
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9849146
Date:05.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977738
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977738
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D219/08, C07D219/04, C07D219/06, C07D285/24, C07D285/16
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:CYCLIN ABHÄNGIGE KINASE(CDK)4 HEMMER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS[2000/06]
English:CYCLIN DEPENDENT KINASE (CDK)4 INHIBITORS AND THEIR USE FOR TREATING CANCER[2000/06]
French:INHIBITEURS DE KINASE DEPENDANTE DE CYCLINE (CDK)4 ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCER[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase26.11.1999National basic fee paid 
26.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
07.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2005Fee for grant paid
07.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
CY16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
IT16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
DE17.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/16]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
IT16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
DE17.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2007/02]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
DE17.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/50]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/49]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
SE16.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]FR2676737  (GROUPE ENSEIGNEMENT RECH CHIM [FR]) [X] 1-21,40-43 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3331459  (FINK MICHAEL DR MED, et al) [X] 2-14,39,40 * the whole document *;
 [YP]WO9749692  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [YP] 2-14,39,40 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3090783  (YALE HARRY L) [X] 2-20,29 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BALL K L ET AL, "CELL-CYCLE ARREST AND INHIBITION OF CDK4 ACTIVITY BY SMALL PEPTIDES BASED ON THE CARBOXY-TERMINAL DOMAIN OF P21WAF1", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (19970101), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 71 - 80, XP002039815 [A] 1-57

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(06)00029-7
 [X]  - MANNANI R ET AL, "Preparation of 3,3'-linked bis(acridinones), 9,9'-linked bis(thioacridines) and 3-3', 9-9' bi-linked bis(thioacridinones)", EUR. J. MED. CHEM. (EJMCA5,02235234);91; VOL.26 (1); PP.117-19, UFR PHARM.;GROUPE ENSEIGN. RECH. CHIM. THER. ORG. PHYS.; MARSEILLE; 13385; FR. (FR), XP002075295 [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MANNANI R ET AL, "Synthesis of two novel thioacridine derivatives and comparison of their in vitro biological activities", CHEM.-BIOL. INTERACT. (CBINA8,00092797);90; VOL.74 (3); PP.291-303, FAC. PHARM.;GROUPE ETUD. RECH. CHIM. THER. ORG. PHYS.; MARSEILLE; FR. (FR), XP002075296 [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MARTYNOVSKII ET AL., "Synthesis , physicochemical properties and pharmacological activity of carbonyl-substituted 2-methoxy-9-thioacridines", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900507), vol. 112, no. 19, Database accession no. 178637g, XP002091482 [X] 1-20,25 * abstract *
 [A]  - WYSOCKA-SKRZELA B ET AL, "Tumor inhibiting compounds. XLIV. Syntheses of N-substituted 1-, 2-, 3-, and 4-methoxyacridones and thioacridones. 2", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19690317), vol. 070, no. 11, Database accession no. 047270, XP002075299 [A] 1-57 * abstract *
    [] - ROCZ. CHEM. (ROCHAC);68; VOL.42 (10); PP.1755-61, POLSKA AKAD. NAUK;GDANSK; POLAND,
 [XA]  - TAIT A ET AL, "Antitumor activity of methyl-4H-1,2,4-benzothiadiazin-3-yl-carbamod ithioate-S,S-dioxide", BOLL. CHIM. FARM. (BCFAAI,00066648);90; VOL.129 (9); PP.273-5, UNIV. MODENA;DIP. SCI. FARM.; ITALY (IT), XP002075297 [X] 2-14,39,40 * the whole document * [A] 1,15-38,41-57
 [XA]  - PARK ET AL., "Synthesis and cytotoxic properties of 3,4-dihydro-3-oxo-2H-1,2,4-benzothiadiazine 1,1-dioxides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960422), vol. 124, no. 17, Database accession no. 232400u, XP002075300 [X] 2-14,39,40 * abstract * [A] 1,15-38,41-57
 [XY]  - LEE ET AL., "Inhibition of cell growth by K+ channel modulators is due to interference with agonist-induced Ca2+ release", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940620), vol. 120, no. 25, Database accession no. 315309, XP002091483 [XY] 2-14,39,40 * abstract *
 [X]  - NAKAHARA ET AL., "Oncostatic activities of some fluoro compounds against Ehrlich carcinoma in mice", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19701012), vol. 73, no. 15, Database accession no. 75517, XP002091484 [X] 2-14,39,40 * abstract *
 [X]  - REDDY ET AL., "Synthesis & biological activity of 3-pyrazolyl-4-substituted-2H-1,2,4-benzothiadiazine 1,1-dioxides", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 24B, pages 1295 - 1297, XP002091480 [X] 2-14,39,40 * the whole document *
 [X]  - JIANG ET AL., "Synthesis and biological evaluation of 2-styrylquinazolin-4(3H)-ones, a new class of antimitotic anticancer agents which inhibit tubulin polymerization", J.MED.CHEM., (1990), vol. 33, pages 1721 - 1728, XP002091481 [X] 2-14,39,40 * page 1723; table IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00168a029
 [X]  - SADANA ETAL., "Antibacterial activity and synthesis of 4-(substituted benzylamino)-1,2,3-benzothiadiazine 1,1-dioxides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900924), vol. 113, no. 13, Database accession no. 115267, XP002091485 [X] 2-20,36-38 * abstract *