Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980434

EP0980434 - INTRACELLULAR PRODUCTION OF HEPATITIS C E2 TRUNCATED POLYPEPTID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/08]INTRACELLULAR PRODUCTION OF HEPATITIS C E1 AND E2 TRUNCATED POLYPEPTIDES
[2009/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2010
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2007/04]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
CHIRON CORPORATION
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOUGTON, Michael
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street - R440
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
02 / CHOO, Qui-Lim
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street - R440
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
03 / ABRIGNANI, Sergio
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street - R440
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
04 / CHIEN, David
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street - R440
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
05 / SELBY, Mark
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street - R440
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
06 / GLAZER, Edward
Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street - R440
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98922096.706.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US09097
Priority number, dateUS19970045675P06.05.1997         Original published format: US 45675 P
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850556
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980434
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980434
Date:29.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/51, C07K14/18, A61K39/29, G01N33/50
[2009/15]
Former International [2000/08]C12N15/40, C07K14/18, A61K39/29, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:INTRAZELLULÄRE HERSTELLUNG VON VERKÜRZTEM HEPATITIS C-POLYPEPTID E2[2009/15]
English:INTRACELLULAR PRODUCTION OF HEPATITIS C E2 TRUNCATED POLYPEPTID[2009/15]
French:PRODUCTION INTRACELLULAIRE D'UN POLYPEPTIDE E2 TRONQUE DIRIGE CONTRE L'HEPATITE C[2009/15]
Former [2000/08]INTRAZELLULÄRE HERSTELLUNG VON VERKÜRTEN HEPATITIS C-POLYPEPTIDEN E1 UND E2
Former [2000/08]INTRACELLULAR PRODUCTION OF HEPATITIS C E1 AND E2 TRUNCATED POLYPEPTIDES
Former [2000/08]PRODUCTION INTRACELLULAIRE DE POLYPEPTIDES E1 ET E2 TRONQUES DIRIGES CONTRE L'HEPATITE C
Entry into regional phase03.12.1999National basic fee paid 
03.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
20.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
12.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2009Fee for grant paid
12.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27]
Request for further processing for:12.08.2005Request for further processing filed
12.08.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.08.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
CY29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
GR30.10.2009
PT29.11.2009
[2012/37]
Former [2011/25]AT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
GR30.10.2009
PT29.11.2009
Former [2010/28]AT29.07.2009
BE29.07.2009
DK29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
PT29.11.2009
Former [2010/19]AT29.07.2009
FI29.07.2009
NL29.07.2009
SE29.07.2009
PT29.11.2009
Cited inInternational search[DXY]WO9604301  (CHIRON CORP [US]) [DX] 12,13 * page 12, line 23 - line 31; figures 1,3,5,6; examples 1,2 * [Y] 1-21;
 [DY]WO9208734  (CHIRON CORP [US]) [DY] 1-21 * examples 3,4; claims 9-12 *
 [DX]  - SPAETE R R ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF THE HEPATITIS C VIRUS E2/NS1 GENE PRODUCT EXPRESSED IN MAMMALIAN CELLS", VIROLOGY, (199206), vol. 188, pages 819 - 830, XP000608114 [DX] 5,6,8,10,13 * page 823, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 826, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 2-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90537-Y
 [DX]  - INUDOH M ET AL, "Antigenicity of hepatitis C virus envelope proteins expressed in Chinese hamster ovary cells", VACCINE, (199612), vol. 14, no. 17, page 1590-1596, XP004016818 [DX] 5-7,10,13,15,17,19,21 * page 1591, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 1592, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1593, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1594, column 1, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00154-5
 [X]  - MATSUURA, Y. ET AL., "Expression of processed envelope protein of hepatitis C virus in mammalian and insect cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY., ICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY US, (199203), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 1425 - 1431, XP002081580 [X] 1-3,12,14,16,18,20 * page 1426, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1428, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 *
Examination   - SPAETE RR ET AL.: "Characterization of the hepatitis C virus E2/NS1 gene product expressed in mammalian cells" VIROLOGY., vol. 188, 1992, pages 819-830, XP000608114 USACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90537-Y
by applicantWO8904669
 WO9011089
 WO9014436
 WO9604301
 WO9208734
    - SPAETE ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 188, pages 819 - 830,
    - INUDOH ET AL., VACCINE, (1996), vol. 14, pages 1590 - 1596,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual,
    - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, vol. I-II,
    - Animal Cell Culture,
    - PERBAL, A PRACTICAL GUIDE TO MOLECULAR CLONING, (1984),
    - Fundamental Virology, vol. I-II,
    - Protein Purification Applications: A Practical Approach,
    - T.E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structures and Molecular Properties, W.H. FREEMAN AND COMPANY,