Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983664

EP0983664 - SCANNER ENHANCED REMOTE CONTROL UNIT AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY LINKING TO ON-LINE RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.04.2005  [2005/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neomedia Technologies, Inc.
Suite 600, 2201 Second Street
Fort Myers, FL 33901 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Neomedia Technologies, Inc
Suite 600, 2201 Second Street
Fort Myers, FL 33901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DURST, Robert, T., Jr.
6054 Timberwoods Circle 240
Fort Myers, FL 33908 / US
02 / HUNTER, Kevin, NeoMedia Technologies, Inc.
Suite 600, 2201 Second Street
Fort Myers, FL 33901 / US
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Lucas, Brian Ronald
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Application number, filing date98922149.407.05.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998US09413
Priority number, dateUS19970045830P07.05.1997         Original published format: US 45830 P
US1997096738308.11.1997         Original published format: US 967383
US1998002391813.02.1998         Original published format: US 23918
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851036
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983664
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search reportUS12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/30
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:MITTELS ABTASTER VERBESSERTE FERNBEDIENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN VERBINDUNG MIT ON-LINE-BETRIEBSMITTELN[2000/10]
English:SCANNER ENHANCED REMOTE CONTROL UNIT AND SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATICALLY LINKING TO ON-LINE RESOURCES[2000/10]
French:UNITE DE COMMANDE A DISTANCE A BALAYAGE AMELIORE ET SYSTEME DE LIAISON AUTOMATIQUE A DES RESSOURCES EN LIGNE[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase07.12.1999National basic fee paid 
07.12.1999Search fee paid 
07.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
10.02.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5506697  (LI CHUNG-CHI [US], et al);
 [X]US5606609  (HOUSER PETER B [US], et al);
 [Y]US5369702  (SHANTON M GREG [US]);
 [Y]US5598473  (LINSKER RALPH [US], et al);
 [Y]US5426779  (CHAMBERS IV LLOYD L [US])