Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981661

EP0981661 - NONAQUEOUS SIZING FOR GLASS AND CARBON FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2008
Database last updated on 20.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo
Ohio 43659 / US
[2007/12]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FLAUTT, Martin, C.
230 Knoll Drive
Granville, OH 43023 / US
02 / DELAVIZ, Yadi
137 Wicklow Drive
Granville, OH 43023 / US
03 / GAO, Gary
912 Glyn Evans Court
Newark, OH 43055 / US
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London
SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2008/08]Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2000/09]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date98922213.812.05.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998US09648
Priority number, dateUS1997085542213.05.1997         Original published format: US 855422
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851853
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981661
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981661
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Search report(s)International search reportUS19.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:D06M15/55, D06M15/507, D06M15/233, D06M15/564, D06M15/59, C03B37/02, C03C17/32
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/09]
TitleGerman:NICHTWÄSSRIGES KLEBEMITTEL FÜR GLAS- UND KOHLENSTOFFFASERN[2000/09]
English:NONAQUEOUS SIZING FOR GLASS AND CARBON FIBERS[2000/09]
French:COMPOSITION D'ENCOLLAGE NON AQUEUSE POUR FIBRES DE VERRE ET DE CARBONE[2000/09]
Entry into regional phase09.12.1999National basic fee paid 
09.12.1999Search fee paid 
09.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2007Fee for grant paid
05.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US4609591  (POLLET JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 16; claim - *;
 [X]JPS57209856  ;
 [X]US4604325  (POLLET JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 41; claim - *
 [X]  1, vol. 1983, no. 06, Database accession no. 1983-13218K, XP002142708 [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *
International search[A]US3615310
 [A]US4487797
 [A]US4752527
 [A]US4798593
 [A]US5063261
 [A]US5219656
 [A]US5258227