blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1009545

EP1009545 - TOUGH-COATED HARD POWDERS AND SINTERED ARTICLES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2011
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.11.2011  [2011/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toth, Richard Edmund
P.O.Box 458
Lumber City, GA 31549 / US
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/46]Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2000/25]Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al
KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date98922257.513.05.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US09767
Priority number, dateUS19970046885P13.05.1997         Original published format: US 46885 P
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9851419
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009545
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009545
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2005
ClassificationIPC:B05D7/00, B22F1/02, B22F3/00, C22C29/00, B22F7/00, B22F7/02
[2005/09]
CPC:
C09K3/1445 (EP,KR,US); B22F1/18 (EP,KR,US); C22C29/00 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,KR,US); B22F2998/00 (EP,KR,US); Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US); Y10T428/257 (EP,US); Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
B22F2998/00, B22F2207/07 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/25]B05D7/00, B22F1/02, B22F3/00, C22C29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/25]
TitleGerman:MIT RESISTENTER BESCHICHTUNG BESCHICHTETE HARTPULVER UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE SINTERPRODUKTE[2000/25]
English:TOUGH-COATED HARD POWDERS AND SINTERED ARTICLES THEREOF[2000/25]
French:POUDRES DURES A REVETEMENT RESISTANT ET ARTICLES FRITTES PRODUITS A PARTIR DE CES POUDRES[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase09.12.1999National basic fee paid 
09.12.1999Search fee paid 
09.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/25]
13.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
13.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.11.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2010Fee for grant paid
31.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination18.01.2008Appeal received No.  T0812/08
18.03.2008Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2009Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
27.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP08007312.5  / EP2009124
Opposition(s)16.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH05186844  ;
 [X]EP0503974  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 12 * column 7, lines 20-53; claims 1-4 *;
 [XA]US5167943  (KUO SHIH-YEE [US], et al) [X] 14,16 * abstract * * the whole document * [A] 1-11;
 [X]EP0570635  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 12 * claims 1,3,4 *;
 [XA]US5489449  (UMEYA KAORU [JP], et al) [X] 14 * column 2, line 36 - line 67; claims 1-5,8 * * abstract *[A] 1-11
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931115), vol. 0176, no. 17, Database accession no. (C - 1129), & JP05186844 A 19930727 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD) [X] 12 * abstract *
International search[A]US4399167  (PIPKIN NOEL J [ZA]);
 [A]US5062865  (CHEN SY-HWA [US], et al);
 [A]US5167943  (KUO SHIH-YEE [US], et al);
 [A]US5489449  (UMEYA KAORU [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5682595  (GONSETH DENIS [CH], et al)
by applicantUS5167943
 US5489449
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.