Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979280

EP0979280 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING A CD53-LIKE TRANSMEMBRANE PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.05.2005  [2005/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
3174 Porter Drive
Palo Alto CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
3174 Porter Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HILLMAN, Jennifer, L.
230 Monroe Drive 12
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / BANDMAN, Olga
366 Anna Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / GOLI, Surya, K.
3311 Cantamar Court
San Jose, CA 95135 / US
04 / GUEGLER, Karl, J.
1048 Oakland Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Wright, Simon Mark , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Wright, Simon Mark , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98922301.113.05.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US09886
Priority number, dateUS1997085514013.05.1997         Original published format: US 855140
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851796
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979280
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K38/17, C07K16/28, C12Q1/68
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:CD53-ÄHNLICH TRANSMEMBRANPROTEIN KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE[2000/07]
English:POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING A CD53-LIKE TRANSMEMBRANE PROTEIN[2000/07]
French:POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT POUR UNE PROTEINE TRANSMEMBRANAIRE DE TYPE CD53[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
23.03.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9201049  (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Emest8 Database Entry Hsa46594 Accession number AA046594; 7 September 1996 HILLIER L. ET AL.:"The WashU-Merck EST project", XP002072295 [X] 3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KURIHARA T ET AL, "Genomic structure and promoter analysis of the gene encoding MM3, a member of transmembrane 4 superfamily", GENE: AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON GENES AND GENOMES, (19970207), vol. 185, no. 2, page 277-283, XP004093270 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(96)00667-1