Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993405

EP0993405 - CARTON FEEDING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Mead Corporation
Courthouse Plaza NE Dayton
Ohio 45463 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
THE MEAD CORPORATION
Courthouse Plaza NE
Dayton Ohio 45463 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DUPERRAY, Philippe
24, rue Bernardin
F-36000 Chateauroux / FR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Avidity IP
Merlin House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2000/16]Hepworth, John Malcolm , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB
Application number, filing date98922488.622.05.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US10542
Priority number, dateGB1997001063923.05.1997         Original published format: GB 9710639
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9852853
Date:26.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993405
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993405
Date:14.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/33]
Search report(s)International search reportEP25.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65B21/10
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:ZUFÜHRMECHANISMUS FÜR KARTONS[2000/16]
English:CARTON FEEDING MECHANISM[2000/16]
French:MECANISME DE CHARGEMENT DE CARTONS[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase22.12.1999National basic fee paid 
22.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
19.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2002Fee for grant paid
20.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[YAX]US4332123  (CALVERT RODNEY K) [Y] 1,5-7 * column A * * column 2, line 24 - line 36; figures 1,2 * [A] 10 [X] 8;
 [YA]US4389832  (CALVERT RODNEY K) [Y] 1,5 * column A * * column 3, line 3 - line 16; figure 5 * [A] 2;
 [Y]EP0552981  (THIELE ENG CO [US]) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *;
 [AX]US5507128  (JOHNSON LLOYD D [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column A; figure 1 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 8 * [X] 10;
 [A]EP0727356  (ELOPAK SYSTEMS [CH]) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2107121  (FEDERAL PAPER BOARD CO INC) [A] 9 * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 24; figures 1-3 *