EP0991515 - INJECTION MOULDING OF LARGE PLASTIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VICFAM PLASTICS PTY. LTD. 20-22 Somerleigh Road Corner, Leslie Road Laverton North, VIC 3026 / AU | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMORGON Victor, Vicfam Plastics Recycling Pty. Ltd 20-22 Somerleigh Road, Cnr. Leslie Road Laverton North, VIC 3026 / AU | 02 /
BERELOVICH, Lazer Flat 5, 16 King Street Elsternwick, VIC 3185 / AU | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Graham Robert Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Forrest, Graham Robert Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98922502.4 | 20.05.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998AU00370 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO07522 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: AU PO752297 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900237 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991515 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/02, B29C45/28, B29C45/77, B29K105/26 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B29C45/28 (EP,US);
B29C45/46 (EP,US);
B29C2045/538 (EP,US);
B29K2105/26 (EP,US);
Y10S264/921 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | B29C45/02, B29C45/28, B29C45/77, // B29K105:26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | SPRITZGIESSEN GROSSER KUNSTSTOFFTEILE | [2000/15] | English: | INJECTION MOULDING OF LARGE PLASTIC COMPONENTS | [2000/15] | French: | MOULAGE PAR INJECTION DE PIECES DE GRANDE TAILLE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 15.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 08.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1729252 (FAHR BUCHER GMBH) [X] 1-14 * page 4 - page 5; figure - *; | [X]FR2225271 (DUCRUEZ RAYMOND [FR]) [X] 1,7,12 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 19; figure - *; | [A]US4498860 (GAHAN GEOFFREY D [GB]) [A] 1,7,12 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 23; figure - *; | [A]EP0520345 (ACRILUX SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7,12* column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 50; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP05293867 ; | [Y]JP55065532 ; | [Y]JP08276454 ; | [X]US4473516 (HUNERBERG EDWARD C [US]); | [X]US4784819 (SPURR ROBERT [US]); | [X]US5192555 (ARNOTT ROBIN [CA]); | [A]US5482663 (HAMMER FLOYD V [US], et al); | [Y]US5511968 (GUZZINI VINICIO [IT], et al) | [Y] - SPI PLASTICS ENGINEERING HANDBOOK OF THE PLASTICS INDUSTRY, INC., 5th Edition, Edited by MICHAEL L. BERINS, Published 1991, by CHAPMAN & HALL (NEW YORK), page 170. | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (M-1558), page 25; & JP,A,05 293 867 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) 9 November 1993., & JP05293867 A 19931109 | [Y] - DERWENT, Accession No. 46954C/27, Class A32; & JP,A,55 065 532 (TOYOTA CENT RES & DEV) 17 May 1980., & JP55065532 A 19800517 | [Y] - DERWENT, Accession No. 97-006816/01, Class A32, (A14); & JP,A,08 276 454 (ARON KASEI KK) 22 October 1996., & JP08276454 A 19961022 |