EP1086568 - METHOD FOR MANAGING AN AUTOMATIC TELEPHONE INFORMATION SERVICE AND ADAPTED AUTOMATIC INFORMATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swisscom Fixnet AG Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6, Worblaufen/Ittigen 3050 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Swisscom Fixnet AG Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6, Worblaufen/Ittingen 3050 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Swisscom AG Ostermundigenstrasse 93 3000 Bern 29 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KOMMER, Robert 45, route du Coteau CH-1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 98922567.7 | 09.06.1998 | [2001/13] | WO1998CH00247 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965215 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086568 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086568 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/50 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H04M3/42204 (EP);
H04M3/4931 (EP);
H04M2201/40 (EP);
H04M2242/22 (EP);
H04M3/42059 (EP);
H04M3/42093 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [2001/13] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONSWEISE UND GERÄT EINES AUTOMATISCHEN TELEFONAUSKUNFTSDIENSTES | [2001/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING AN AUTOMATIC TELEPHONE INFORMATION SERVICE AND ADAPTED AUTOMATIC INFORMATION SYSTEM | [2001/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UN SERVICE DE RENSEIGNEMENT TELEPHONIQUE AUTOMATISE ET SYSTEME DE RENSEIGNEMENT AUTOMATIQUE ADAPTE | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 12.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 09.06.2003 | BE | 30.06.2003 | [2008/33] |
Former [2004/39] | LU | 09.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO8900793 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [DY] 5,33 * abstract *; | [DY]US5165095 (BORCHERDING MARK A [US]) [DY] 2,27,32,43 * column 2, lines 1-20 *; | [XY]CA2091658 (LENNIG MATTHEW [CA], et al) [X] 1,6-9,23,25,30,31,36,37,45,46 * abstract * * page 5, lines 6-18 * * page 21, lines 9-18 * [Y] 2,4,5,10-13,15,17-20,23,24,26-29,32-34,38-40,43,44; | [Y]WO9514360 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 26,28 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9724862 (MCI COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [Y] 11,12,39,40 * abstract *; | [Y]US5689547 (MOELNE ANDERS LENNAR [US]) [Y] 4,44,23,24,29 * column 4, lines 30-39 * * column 5, lines 55-65 *; | [Y]US5732187 (SCRUGGS JEFFREY L [US], et al) [Y] 2,19,20,32 * column 2, lines 18-52 *; | [X]WO9816048 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,10,13-16,31,38,41,46 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 59 *; | [YA] - KELLNER A ET AL, "PADIS - An automatic telephone switchboard and directory information system", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (199710), vol. 23, no. 1-2, page 95-111, XP004117212 [Y] 10,13,15,18,38 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [04.3] * [A] 21,42 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-6393(97)00036-8 | [Y] - WESTALL F A ET AL, "SPEECH TECHNOLOGY FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (19960101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 9 - 27, XP000554636 [Y] 10,17,34 * paragraph [06.2] * * paragraph [06.4] * |