blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1004126

EP1004126 - ELECTRICAL COMPONENT, SPECIALLY A CHIP INDUCTIVE RESISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2003/33]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
EPCOS AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81541 München / DE
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS GmbH & CO. KG
Balanstrasse 73
81541 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ECKARDT, Hans-Dieter
Wiedenwiesen 26
D-89542 Herbrechtingen / DE
02 / ESPENHAIN, Manfred
Randstrasse 6
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
03 / SCHERER, Wilfried
Heckentalstrasse 38
D-89518 Heidenheim / DE
04 / SCHILLING, Bruno
Brunnenweg 29
D-89429 Bachhagel / DE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schlossschmidstrasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2004/04]Epping, Hermann, Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2000/28]Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2000/22]Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date98922590.911.03.1998
[2000/22]
WO1998DE00733
Priority number, dateDE199711046213.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19710462
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9840897
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004126
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004126
Date:15.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01F27/29
[2000/22]
CPC:
H01F27/292 (EP); H05K3/3426 (EP); Y02P70/50 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/22]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES BAUELEMENT, INSBESONDERE CHIP-INDUKTIVITÄT[2000/22]
English:ELECTRICAL COMPONENT, SPECIALLY A CHIP INDUCTIVE RESISTOR[2000/22]
French:COMPOSANT ELECTRIQUE, EN PARTICULIER UNE INDUCTANCE PASTILLE[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1999National basic fee paid 
03.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
15.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2007Fee for grant paid
27.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.11.1999M01   Fee paid on   08.12.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4797648  (KANEKO TOSHIMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 25 - line 40 * * column 3, line 12 - line 23; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 4,5,7;
 [XA]US5003279  (MORINAGA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 9; figure 4 * [A] 4,5,7;
 [XA]US4725806  (CHAMBERLIN EDWARD R [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 27 - line 40; figure 4 * [A] 4;
 [A]EP0702378  (SIEMENS MATSUSHITA COMPONENTS [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 11 - line 21; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.