Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061851

EP1061851 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING AN KINETIC PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2002
Database last updated on 13.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Claussen, Claus-Frenz
Kurhausstrasse 12
97688 Bad Kissingen / DE
[2002/08]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Claussen, Claus-Franz
Kurhausstrasse 12
97688 Bad Kissingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / CLAUSSEN, Claus-Frenz
Kurhausstrasse 12
D-97688 Bad Kissingen / DE
02 / HARALANOV, Svetlozar
74 B Sveti Georgy Sofiisky Street
1606 Sofia / BG
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte
Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[2000/52]
Application number, filing date98922614.707.03.1998
[2000/52]
WO1998EP01341
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9944502
Date:10.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1061851
Date:27.12.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1061851
Date:20.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/11
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINES BEWEGUNGSMUSTERS[2000/52]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING AN KINETIC PATTERN[2000/52]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EVALUATION D'UN SCHEMA CINEMATIQUE[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2000National basic fee paid 
30.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
03.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.2001Fee for grant paid
01.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)21.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9115148  (FUHR ARLAN W [US]) [X] 1,15,17,19 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 18, line 6 - page 21, line 5 * * abstract *;
 [A]US4631676  (PUGH JAMES W [US]) [A] 1,15,16 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 56; figure -; claims 1,7-10 *;
 [DA]DE3829885  (CLAUSSEN CLAUS FRENZ PROF DR M [DE]) [DA] 1,15 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 34; figures 1,8,9; claim - *;
 [A]  - SAFAEE-RAD R ET AL, "THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR FUNCTIONAL ARM MOTION STUDY", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING, (19901101), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 569 - 573, XP000220093 [A] 1,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02442609
 [A]  - CARRERA D J ET AL, "THE RELIABILITY OF POSTURAL SWAY MEASURES USING THE 2SPACE TRACKER", CLINICAL BIOMECHANICS, (19960901), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 361 - 363, XP000599794 [A] 1-5,7,15-18,20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0268-0033(96)00009-5
Examination   - "Forschungsbericht Cranio-Corpo-Graphie (CCG)" aus der Schriftreihe des Hauptverbandes der gewerblichen Berufsgenossenschaften e.V.; Juni 1986: Seiten 7 bis 61; ISBN 3-88383-126-3
by applicantDE3829885
    - Druckschrift "Forschungsbericht Cranio-Corpo-Graphie (CCG), (198606), ISBN 3-88383-126-3