24.04.2009 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
04.04.2009 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.04.2009 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
20.02.2009 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
19.12.2008 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.12.2008 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.07.2006 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
06.04.2006 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
26.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
28.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
14.03.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
22.11.2004 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
15.09.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
11.06.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
21.05.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
12.05.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
09.01.2004 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
05.12.2003 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
29.11.2003 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
28.11.2003 |
Opposition filed |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
21.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
14.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
05.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
22.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
11.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
23.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.08.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
14.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.05.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.05.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
08.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.02.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.09.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.07.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
06.07.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
02.07.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
18.06.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
18.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.11.2000 |
First examination report |
|
31.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.11.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
26.11.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
19.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|