Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969803

EP0969803 - EMULSIFIER-FREE FINELY DISPERSED SYSTEMS OF THE WATER-IN-OIL TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / GERS-BARLAG, Heinrich
Kiebitzgrund 11
D-25495 Kummerfeld / DE
02 / MÜLLER, Anja
Wiesenstrasse 5
D-23843 Rümpel / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98922627.921.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01661
Priority number, dateDE199711248325.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712483
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842300
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969803
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969803
Date:26.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/42, A61K7/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:EMULGATORFREIE FEINDISPERSE SYSTEME VOM TYP ÖL-IN-WASSER[2000/02]
English:EMULSIFIER-FREE FINELY DISPERSED SYSTEMS OF THE WATER-IN-OIL TYPE[2000/02]
French:SYSTEMES EN DISPERSION FINE SANS EMULSIFIANTS[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase31.07.1999National basic fee paid 
31.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2002Fee for grant paid
12.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.11.2003  03.12.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.11.2003  08.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/13]
Opponent(s)01  21.11.2003  03.12.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.11.2003  08.01.2004  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2004/04]
Opponent(s)01  21.11.2003  03.12.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.11.2003   
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm, Volker, Dr.
Maiwald Patentanwalts-GmbH Ballindamm 37
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2004/03]
Opponent(s)01  21.11.2003   
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
13.01.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
16.04.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/22]
Appeal following opposition04.04.2006Appeal received No.  T0489/06
08.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
Request for further processing for:27.06.2001Request for further processing filed
27.06.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
AT21.03.2003
LU21.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
SE22.03.2005
[2005/50]
Former [2005/02]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
AT21.03.2003
LU21.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2004/39]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
AT21.03.2003
LU21.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2004/31]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
AT21.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2004/28]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
BE31.03.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2004/22]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
CH31.03.2003
LI31.03.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2004/02]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
DK26.05.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2004/01]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
IE26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2003/46]FI26.02.2003
GR26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2003/43]FI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
PT26.05.2003
Former [2003/41]FI26.02.2003
NL26.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0823249  (OREAL [FR]) [PX] 1-8 * column 5, lines 10-52 * * column 6, lines 20-26 * * column 6, lines 50-56; example .; claims 1-10-12,14 *;
 [XD]EP0610926  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-6,8,9 * page 3, lines 32-44 * * page 4, lines 1-7; claims 1-4,6,8 *;
 [XD]DE4425268  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [XD] 1,4,8,9 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 45; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0680746  (SPIRIG AG [CH]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, lines 43-46; claims 1-3,5 *