Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973780

EP0973780 - ANTIBACTERIAL SUBSTITUTED 7-ACYLAMINO -3-(METHYLHYDRAZONO) METHYL-CEPHALOSPORINS AND INTERMEDIATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE Gesellschaft m.b.H.
6250 Kundl / AT
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
6250 Kundl / AT
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BIOCHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.
6250 Kundi / AT
Inventor(s)01 / ASCHER, Gerd
Daxerfeld 3
A-6250 Kundl / AT
02 / WIESER, Josef
Siegfeld 95
A-6403 Polling / AT
03 / SCHRANZ, Michael
Burghardtgasse 7/18
A-1200 Wien / AT
04 / LUDESCHER, Johannes
Kleinsoell 101
A-6252 Breitenbach / AT
05 / HILDEBRANDT, Johannes
St. Laurentgasse 12
A-2512 Oeynhausen / AT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Grubb, Philip William , et al
Novartis AG
Corporate Intellectual Property
Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Grubb, Philip William , et al
Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35
4002 Basel / CH
Former [2000/04]Becker, Konrad , et al
Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date98922631.101.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01890
Priority number, dateAT1997000054601.04.1997         Original published format: AT 54697
AT1997000054701.04.1997         Original published format: AT 54797
AT1997000054801.04.1997         Original published format: AT 54897
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843981
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973780
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973780
Date:02.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D501/38, C07D295/20, A61K31/545
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesRO04.09.1999
SI04.09.1999
TitleGerman:ANTIBAKTERIELLE SUBSTITUIERTE 7-ACYLAMINO-3-(METHYLHYDRAZONO)METHYL-CEPHALOSPORINE UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE[2000/04]
English:ANTIBACTERIAL SUBSTITUTED 7-ACYLAMINO -3-(METHYLHYDRAZONO) METHYL-CEPHALOSPORINS AND INTERMEDIATES[2000/04]
French:CEPHALOSPORINES ANTIBACTERIENNES DE 7-ACYLAMINO -3-METHYLHYDRAZONOMETHYLE SUBSTITUE ET INTERMEDIAIRES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase04.09.1999National basic fee paid 
04.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
06.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2003Fee for grant paid
02.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03000220.8  / EP1300408
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9635692  (BIOCHEMIE GMBH) [X] 1-15 * see pages 33-48, examples 42,46,50,66,115,139 and claims *;
 [A]GB2151617  (BIOGAL GYOGYSZERGYAR) [A] 10 * the whole document *