EP0975872 - STARTER INTERLOCK SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH AN AUTOMATIC GEAR BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCHRICH, Gerhard Untere Holunderstaffel 11 D-88069 Tettnang / DE | 02 /
HORSAK, Günther Jasminweg 13/2 D-88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Andreas Hochstrasse 56 D-66280 Sulzbach / DE | [2000/05] | Application number, filing date | 98922660.0 | 08.04.1998 | [2000/05] | WO1998EP02023 | Priority number, date | DE1997115384 | 14.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19715384 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846877 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975872 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975872 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/10, F02N11/08 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
F02N11/103 (EP,US);
F02N11/10 (KR);
B60K28/10 (EP,US);
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
F16H63/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/05] | Title | German: | ANLASSSPERRSYSTEM FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM AUTOMATGETRIEBE | [2000/05] | English: | STARTER INTERLOCK SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH AN AUTOMATIC GEAR BOX | [2000/05] | French: | SYSTEME D'ANTIDEMARRAGE POUR UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR EQUIPE D'UNE BOITE DE VITESSES AUTOMATIQUE | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3303455 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US4485694 (MOCHIDA HARUO [JP]); | [A]EP0475390 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4218708 (MERCEDES-BENZ); | [DA] - FÖRSTER, automatische fahrzeuggetriebe, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1991), XP002074879 [DA] * page 344 - page 347 * * page 392; figure 10.48 * |