Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977500

EP0977500 - PANTS, ESPECIALLY MEN'S UNDERPANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schatz, Siegfried H.
Im Asemwald 4/10
D-70599 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Gahlert, Stefan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Gahlert, Stefan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/06]Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98922723.616.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998EP02233
Priority number, dateDE1997207233U22.04.1997         Original published format: DE 29707233 U
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847397
Date:29.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977500
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A41B9/02, A61F5/40
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2000/06]
TitleGerman:HOSE, INSBESONDERE HERRENUNTERHOSE[2000/06]
English:PANTS, ESPECIALLY MEN'S UNDERPANTS[2000/06]
French:CULOTTE, NOTAMMENT SLIP D'HOMME[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
26.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1220103  (COSTA ET AL.) [X] 1-3,7 * page 1, column 2, line 17 - line 30 * * page 2, column 1, line 13 - line 24; figure - *;
 [XA]FR2621457  (SILVAIN ANDRE [FR]) [X] 2,3,7 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 5; figure 6 * [A] 9;
 [X]FR1575658  (S.A. LÉON OLIVIER ET AL.) [X] 1,7 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3503888  (SCHADLER FRIEDRICH) [A] 2,7,9,11,12 * page 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US2176790  (COPPEL CHARLES R, et al) [A] 2,3,7,9 * page 1, column 2, line 14 - line 23; figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US4400832  (KINDER CAROLYN [US]) [A] 1-4,7 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 36; figure 7 *;
 [A]US4523337  (LEIBOWITZ MARTIN N [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 6 - line 24; figure - *