blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980477

EP0980477 - DELIVERY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOHLHAAS, Helmut
Kupferstrasse 25
36208 Wildeck / DE
02 / WILHELM, Dieter
Blücherstrasse 18
36179 Bebra / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Rassler, Andrea, et al
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98922752.521.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998EP02338
Priority number, dateDE199711879103.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19718791
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9850701
Date:12.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980477
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:F04D13/06, F04D3/02
[2000/08]
CPC:
F04D3/02 (EP,US); F04D13/0646 (EP,US); F04D13/0666 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/08]
TitleGerman:FÖRDEREINHEIT[2000/08]
English:DELIVERY UNIT[2000/08]
French:UNITE DE REFOULEMENT[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
01.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/20]
06.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH07180689  ;
 [A]US3870433  (RAIKOV IVAN YAKOVLEVICH, et al) [A] 8* figures 1,2 *;
 [XA]US4408966  (MARUYAMA TERUO [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 22 - line 46; figure - * [A] 2;
 [A]US4415308  (MARUYAMA TERUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4114989  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US5588812  (TAYLOR LYNN P [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]  - CHO C P ET AL, "A NOVEL INTEGRATED ELECTRIC MOTOR/PUMP FOR UNDERWATER APPLICATIONS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19960415), vol. 79, no. 8, PART 02A, pages 5548 - 5550, XP000695824 [X] 1,3,5,6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.362304
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, & JP07180689 A 19950718 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.