Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978020

EP0978020 - PROPORTIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RICHTER, Martin
Brahmstrasse 6
D-81677 München / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date98922762.422.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998EP02374
Priority number, dateDE199711689722.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19716897
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848329
Date:29.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978020
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978020
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G05D7/00, G05D16/16, G05D11/035, G05D11/13, G01F1/74, G01F11/06, F16K31/365
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/06]
TitleGerman:DOSIERVORRICHTUNG[2000/06]
English:PROPORTIONER[2000/06]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1999National basic fee paid 
08.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
08.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
14.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.02.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2001Fee for grant paid
07.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT19.12.2001
NL19.12.2001
DK19.03.2002
AT22.04.2002
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2003/47]NL19.12.2001
DK19.03.2002
AT22.04.2002
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
Former [2003/46]NL19.12.2001
DK19.03.2002
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
Former [2003/31]NL19.12.2001
CH30.04.2002
LI30.04.2002
Former [2003/09]NL19.12.2001
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0239331  (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 1-22 * * column 6, line 4 - column 14, line 3; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 2-8;
 [A]US4330003  (D ALONZO LODOVICO) [A] 1-8 * column 1, lines 9-21 * * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]GB2064826  (AGMET INSTR) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 127 - column 3, line 24; figure 1 *