Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985259

EP0985259 - CABLE DRUM WITH INTEGRATED FREQUENCY CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacker Construction Equipment AG
Preussenstrasse 41
80809 München / DE
[2002/50]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
WACKER-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG
Preussenstrasse 41
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STEFFEN, Michael
Kreuzweg 32
D-82131 Gauting / DE
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Hoffmann, Jörg Peter
Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Hoffmann, Jörg Peter, Dr. Ing.
Müller & Hoffmann Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date98922785.529.04.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998EP02542
Priority number, dateDE199712210727.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19722107
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9854809
Date:03.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985259
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985259
Date:16.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/42]
Search report(s)International search reportEP03.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02G11/02
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:KABELTROMMEL MIT INTEGRIERTEM FREQUENZUMFORMER[2000/11]
English:CABLE DRUM WITH INTEGRATED FREQUENCY CONVERTER[2000/11]
French:ENROULEUR DE CABLE A CONVERTISSEUR DE FREQUENCE INTEGRE[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase01.06.1999National basic fee paid 
01.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
19.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2001Fee for grant paid
19.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
[2004/22]
Former [2004/21]GB16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
Former [2003/30]NL16.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE4405391  (BRENNENSTUHL KG HUGO [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]DE8916195U  (SCHERER NORBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3921679  (STEMMANN TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3310311  (STEMMANN AUGUST KG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *