Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979538

EP0979538 - ANTENNA SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR POINTING MOVING SATELLITES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2001/42]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BOUSQUET, Jacques
3, avenue de Wailly
F-78290 Croissy/Seine / FR
02 / MENARD, Pierre
12, rue de la Cavée
F-95100 Argenteuil / FR
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Smith, Bradford Lee , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Smith, Bradford Lee , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98922876.227.04.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998FR00842
Priority number, dateFR1997000540730.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9705407
FR1997000710009.06.1997         Original published format: FR 9707100
[2000/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9849745
Date:05.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979538
Date:16.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979538
Date:17.10.2001
Language:FR
[2001/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01Q3/02, H01Q3/08
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:ANTENNENSYSTEM, INSBESONDERE ZUR AUSRICHTUNG AUF SATELLITEN IN NIEDRIGER UMLAUFBAHN[2000/07]
English:ANTENNA SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR POINTING MOVING SATELLITES[2000/07]
French:SYSTEME D'ANTENNES, NOTAMMENT POUR POINTAGE DE SATELLITES DEFILANTS[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase30.11.1999National basic fee paid 
30.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
29.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
25.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
17.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2001Fee for grant paid
27.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE17.01.2002
[2002/27]
Cited inInternational search[A]US4791428  (ANDERSON KEITH V [US]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 15 - column 2, line 37; figures 1,3-5,13 *;
 [A]EP0600699  (ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5245348  (NISHIKAWA KUNITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * column A; figures 1,4-8 *