Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975433

EP0975433 - FLASK FOR DISPENSING LIQUID, CREAM OR GEL COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR FILTERING INCOMING AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REXAM DISPENSING SYSTEMS
15 bis, Route Nationale
76470 Le Tréport / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
Rexam Dispensing Systems
15 bis, route Nationale
76470 Le Tréport / FR
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
REXAM SOFAB
15 bis, route Nationale
76470 Le Tréport / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HENNEMANN, Pascal
42, rue Saint Laurent
F-76260 Eu / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Busnel, Jean-Benoît , et al
NOVAGRAAF IP
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois- Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]Busnel, Jean-Benoît , et al
Howrey Simon Arnold & White, CityPoint, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
Former [2000/05]Busnel, Jean-Benoît , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date98922882.028.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998FR00848
Priority number, dateFR1997000522728.04.1997         Original published format: FR 9705227
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9848943
Date:05.11.1998
Language:FR
[1998/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975433
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975433
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:B05B11/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:MIT EINER DIE EINTRETENDE LUFT FILTERNDEN VORRICHTUNG VERSEHENE ABGABEFLASCHE FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT, EINE CREME ODER EIN GEL[2000/05]
English:FLASK FOR DISPENSING LIQUID, CREAM OR GEL COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR FILTERING INCOMING AIR[2000/05]
French:FLACON DE DISTRIBUTION POUR LIQUIDE, CREME OU GEL COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF FILTRANT DE L'AIR ENTRANT[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase26.11.1999National basic fee paid 
26.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
26.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2003Fee for grant paid
19.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.2004   
Ing. Erich Pfeiffer GmbH
Öschlestrasse 124-126
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Opponent's representative
Beier, Joachim
Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/21]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2004   
Ing. Erich Pfeiffer GmbH
Öschlestrasse 124-126
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Opponent's representative
Beier, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing
Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
29.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.10.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.03.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/40]
12.03.2008Date of oral proceedings
29.04.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.04.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.04.2006
CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
IE28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
GR02.11.2006
GB28.04.2007
IT28.04.2007
CH30.04.2007
ES30.04.2007
LI30.04.2007
NL01.11.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/47]AT28.04.2006
CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
IE28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
GR02.11.2006
GB28.04.2007
CH30.04.2007
ES30.04.2007
LI30.04.2007
NL01.11.2007
Former [2008/21]AT28.04.2006
CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
IE28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
GB28.04.2007
CH30.04.2007
LI30.04.2007
NL01.11.2007
Former [2008/16]AT28.04.2006
CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
IE28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
CH30.04.2007
LI30.04.2007
NL01.11.2007
Former [2007/29]AT28.04.2006
CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
IE28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
Former [2007/23]AT28.04.2006
CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
Former [2007/22]CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
DK01.05.2006
PT30.10.2006
Former [2007/17]CY28.04.2006
FI28.04.2006
SE29.04.2006
LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT30.10.2006
Former [2007/07]LU30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0487412  (PROMOTION RECH INNOVAT TECH [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - line 40 * * column 5, line 12 - line 26 * * column 5, line 39 - line 44; claims 2-4 *;
 [A]EP0189549  (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 26 - page 9, line 7 *