Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980511

EP0980511 - TYRE PRESSURE DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNAP-ON EQUIPMENT LIMITED
Unit12 Horsleys Fields King's Lynn
Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
SNAP-ON EQUIPMENT LIMITED
Unit12 Horsleys Fields
King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Barbara, Lynn
Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields
King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB
02 / SMITH, Paul
Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields
King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB
03 / STOLLERY, David
Sun Electric UK Limited Unit 12 Horsleys Fields
King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 5DD / GB
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Lamb, Richard Andrew
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]Lamb, Richard Andrew
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate
Peterborough, Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB
Former [2000/08]Archer, Philip Bruce
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate
Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB
Application number, filing date98922914.114.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998GB01373
Priority number, dateGB1997000964514.05.1997         Original published format: GB 9709645
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9852008
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980511
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980511
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01L17/00, E01F11/00, G01G19/02
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:REIFENDRUCKBESTIMMUNG[2000/08]
English:TYRE PRESSURE DETERMINATION[2000/08]
French:MESURE DE LA PRESSION DE PNEUMATIQUES[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase14.12.1999National basic fee paid 
14.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
17.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2004Fee for grant paid
10.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FR12.05.2004
IT12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
IE14.05.2004
GB12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
FR12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
IE14.05.2004
GB12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2006/13]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
IE14.05.2004
GB12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2005/46]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
IE14.05.2004
GB12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2005/30]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
IE14.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
DE01.12.2004
Former [2005/24]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
IE14.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2005/11]AT12.05.2004
CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2004/52]CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH12.05.2004
LI12.05.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0502803  (ELECTRONIQUE CONTROLE MESURE [FR]) [X] 2,3,5,7,10-15 * figures 1A-1E; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0387092  (GEBERT FRANZ JOSEF [ZA], et al) [X] 2,5,10 * page 4, line 6 - line 47 *;
 [A]US5260520  (MUHS JEFFREY D [US], et al) [A] 9,16,17 * column 5, line 45 - line 63; figure 1 *