Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990635

EP0990635 - HYDROXYCYCLOPENTANONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAKARA BIO INC.
4-1, Seta 3-chome Otsu-shi
Shiga / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
TAKARA BIO INC.
4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga / JP
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Takara Shuzo Co, Ltd.
609, Takenaka-cho, Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8061 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOJIMA, Kaoru Biomedical Group
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd. 82-4, Oaza Zaifu-cho
Hirosaki-shi Aomori 036-8216 / JP
02 / IKAI, Katsushige Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd. 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2193 / JP
03 / ENOKI, Tatsuji Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd. 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2193 / JP
04 / KOYAMA, Nobuto Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd. 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2193 / JP
05 / KATO, Ikunoshin Central Research Laboratories
Takara Shuzo Co., Ltd. 4-1, Seta 3-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2193 / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Wakerley, Helen Rachael
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Wakerley, Helen Rachael
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date98923077.601.06.1998
[2000/14]
WO1998JP02425
Priority number, dateJP1997017119313.06.1997         Original published format: JP 17119397
JP1997020390315.07.1997         Original published format: JP 20390397
[2000/14]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9856745
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990635
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990635
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07C49/493, C07C45/56, C07C45/64, A61K31/12, C07C45/59, C07C45/48
[2001/50]
Former International [2000/14]C07C49/493, C07C45/56, C07C45/64, A61K31/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:HYDROXYCYCLOPENTANONE[2000/14]
English:HYDROXYCYCLOPENTANONE[2000/14]
French:HYDROXYCYCLOPENTANONE[2000/14]
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999Translation filed 
11.10.1999National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Search fee paid 
11.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/14]
21.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
CY17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
IE01.06.2004
LU01.06.2004
[2007/17]
Former [2005/24]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
IE01.06.2004
LU01.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
LU01.06.2004
Former [2004/41]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI17.09.2003
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH05238978  (SANTEN PHARMA CO LTD);
 [A]JPS611636  (TEIJIN LTD)
 [A]  - ELLIOTT J. D., ET AL., "SYNTHESES OF (+-)- AND (-)-PENTENOMYCIN I.", Tetrahedron Letters, Pergamon, GB, GB, (19830101), vol. 24., no. 09., doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)81578-6, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 965 - 968., XP002913104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)81578-6