Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980537

EP0980537 - OPTICAL SCANNER AND IMAGE READER FOR READING IMAGES AND DECODING OPTICAL INFORMATION INCLUDING ONE AND TWO DIMENSIONAL SYMBOLOGIES AT VARIABLE DEPTH OF FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.07.2011  [2011/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, Inc.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742-1320 / US
[2007/46]
Former [2003/30]For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, Inc.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742-1320 / US
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
Symagery Microsystems Inc.
3026 Solandt Road
Ottawa, Ontario K2K 2A5 / CA
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Roustaei, Alexander R.
2454 Rue Denise
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Roustaei, Alexander, R.
2454 Rue Denise
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
 [2002/39]
Former [2000/08]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/26]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2006/24]Kopf, Korbinian Paul , et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2003/33]Wardle, Callum Tarn
Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2000/08]Beck, Simon Antony , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date98923333.305.05.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US09092
Priority number, dateUS19970045542P05.05.1997         Original published format: US 45542 P
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850814
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980537
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980537
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02B26/08, G02B26/10, G02B6/32, G06K7/10, H01L21/60, H01J3/14
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/08]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE ABTASTVORRICHTUNG UND BILDLESER ZUM BILDLESEN UND DEKODIEREN OPTISCHER INFORMATION MIT EINE-UND ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN SYMBOLEN BEI VERÄNDERLICHER TIEFENSCHÄRFE[2000/08]
English:OPTICAL SCANNER AND IMAGE READER FOR READING IMAGES AND DECODING OPTICAL INFORMATION INCLUDING ONE AND TWO DIMENSIONAL SYMBOLOGIES AT VARIABLE DEPTH OF FIELD[2000/08]
French:EXPLORATEUR OPTIQUE ET LECTEUR D'IMAGES POUR LA LECTURE D'IMAGES ET LE DECODAGE D'INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES, Y COMPRIS LES SYMBOLES EN UNE ET DEUX DIMENSIONS A PROFONDEUR DE CHAMP VARIABLE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Search fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
16.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.05.2007
16.05.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.05.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2007Fee for grant paid
27.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07020058.9  / EP1916557
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Request for further processing for:13.04.2006Request for further processing filed
13.04.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.05.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT31.05.2008
[2011/27]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5414251  (DURBIN DENNIS A [US]) [A] 1,5,8,9,11,16,17,20 * column 4, line 6 - line 12 *
International search[Y]US5625483  (SWARTZ JEROME [US]);
 [Y]US5202785  (NELSON WILLIAM E [US]);
 [Y]US5188983  (GUCKEL HENRY [US], et al);
 [Y]US5150250  (SETANI MICHITAKA [JP]);
 [Y]US5100220  (VOEGELI OTTO [US]);
 [Y]US4930848  (KNOWLES CARL H [US]);
 [Y]US4733067  (OINOUE HIROSHI [JP], et al)
ExaminationUS5561283
 WO9715024
 WO9603708
 US5210398