Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031149

EP1031149 - ROBOTIC DOCKING APPARATUS FOR A CARTRIDGE LIBRARY SYSTEM HAVING A CARTRIDGE STORAGE ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STORAGE TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
2270 South 88th Street
Louisville, CO 80028-4309 / US
[2000/35]
Inventor(s)01 / FALACE, Joseph, P.
131 S. Madison Avenue
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
02 / MANES, Joseph, P.
7571 Ames Street
Arvada, CO 80003 / US
03 / PLUTT, Daniel, J.
1049 E. Iliff Way
Superior, CO 80027 / US
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Mathisen, Macara & Co., The Coach House, 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date98923351.501.06.1998
[2000/35]
WO1998US09359
Priority number, dateUS1997087963820.06.1997         Original published format: US 879638
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9859339
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1031149
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1031149
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G11B15/68, G11B17/22
[2000/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/35]
TitleGerman:ROBOTER DOCKVORRICHTUNG FÜR KASSETTENBIBLIOTHEKSYSTEM MIT KASSETTENSPEICHERANORD-NUNG[2000/35]
English:ROBOTIC DOCKING APPARATUS FOR A CARTRIDGE LIBRARY SYSTEM HAVING A CARTRIDGE STORAGE ARRAY[2000/35]
French:APPAREIL D'ACCOSTAGE ROBOTISE POUR UN SYSTEME DE BIBLIOTHEQUE DE CARTOUCHES POSSEDANT UN MAGASIN DE RANGEMENT DE CARTOUCHES[2000/35]
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/35]
08.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2002Fee for grant paid
12.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4989191  (KUO SHEAFEN F [US]) [X] 1,2,9,13,14 * column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 21; figures 1A-5 * [A] 3-8,10-12;
 [XA]US3938190  (SEMMLOW JOHN LEONARD, et al) [X] 1,2,9-14 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 8; figures 2,3 * [A] 3-8;
 [PXA]US5691859  (ULRICH MICHAEL [US], et al) [PX] 1,13,14 * column 3, line 56 - column 7, line 43; figure - * [PA] 2-12;
 [A]EP0709169  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13,14 * column 18, line 10 - column 19, line 32; figures 26-34 *;
 [A]US3584879  (BAN ITSUKI) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 49; figures 12,13 *;
 [A]US5065265  (PIERRAT MICHEL A [US]) [A] 1,13,14 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US4742405  (TERANISHI SHUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1,13,14 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]US5242259  (YEAKLEY LESTER M [US]) [A] 1,13,14 * column A; figure - *