Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017411

EP1017411 - COMPOSITIONS SUITABLE FOR CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THE HORMONE GnRH AND ITS ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.10.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Durect Corporation
10240 Bubb Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2005/12]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Southern Biosystems, Inc.
756 Tom Martin Drive
Birmingham, AL 35211-4467 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURNS, Patrick, J.
2368 Woodfield Circle
Lexington, KY 40515 / US
02 / GIBSON, John, W.
4558 Washington Valley Road
Springville, AL 35146 / US
03 / TIPTON, Arthur, J.
686 Summit Point
Birmingham, AL 35226 / US
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Boff, James Charles
Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Boff, James Charles
Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date98923763.126.05.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998US10668
Priority number, dateUS19970047789P28.05.1997         Original published format: US 47789 P
US1997000112330.12.1997         Original published format: US 1123
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9853837
Date:03.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017411
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017411
Date:30.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/09, A61K47/26, A61P15/08
[2002/33]
Former International [2000/28]A61K38/02, A61K9/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN GEEIGNET ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG DES HORMONS GNRH UND DESSEN ANALOGA[2000/28]
English:COMPOSITIONS SUITABLE FOR CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THE HORMONE GnRH AND ITS ANALOGS[2000/28]
French:COMPOSITION ASSURANT LA LIBERATION REGULEE DE L'HORMONE GNRH ET DE SES ANALOGUES[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1999National basic fee paid 
17.12.1999Search fee paid 
17.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/28]
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2005Fee for grant paid
27.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.06.200104   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
CY30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
PT02.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/16]AT30.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/49]AT30.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
PT02.05.2006
Former [2006/38]AT30.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
GR28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT30.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT30.11.2005
FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
DK28.02.2006
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
SE28.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI30.11.2005
NL30.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9639995  (SOUTHERN BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * see claims 1-6,11,16,38-46 and pages 25-26 *;
 [XY]WO9116929  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * see abstract, page 6 lines 17-19, page 15 lines 1-3, claim 5 * [Y] 1-12;
 [XY]EP0481732  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * see page 5, claims 15 and 23-24 * [Y] 1-12;
 [X]  BURNS, P. ET AL, "Pharmacodynamic evaluation of the SABER delivery system for the controlled release of the GnRH analog deslorelin acetate for advancing ovulation in cyclic mares", PROC. INT. SYMP. CONTROLLED RELEASE BIOACT. MATER. (1997), 24TH, 737-738, XP002203242 [X] 1-12 * see the whole document *
 [XY]  MATSUBARA K ET AL, "CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THE LHRH AGONIST BUSERELIN ACETATE FROM INJECTABLE SUSPENSIONS CONTAINING TRIACETYLATED CYCLODEXTRINS IN ANOIL VEHICLE", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19940901), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 173 - 180, XP000458317 [X] 1,2,5,7 * see abstract and page 173 * [Y] 1-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(94)00030-1
 [Y]  GUNNET J W ET AL, "EFFECTS OF A SUSTAINED RELEASE FORMULATION OF THE GONADOTROPHIN-RELEASING HORME AGONIST HISTRELIN AND SERUM CONCENTRATIONS OF GONADOTROPHINS AND OESTRADIOL, AND OVARIAN LH/HUMAN CHORIONIC GONADOTROPHIN RECEPTOR CONTENT IN THE RAT", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, BRISTOL, GB, (1991), vol. 2, no. 131, ISSN 0022-0795, pages 211 - 218, XP001078783 [Y] 1-12 * see page 212 left col. *
 [XY]  REEL J.R. ET AL., "Stimulation of LH release and ovulation in the rat by cutaneous application of luteinizing hormone-releasing hormone (LH-RH)in dimethyl sulfoxide (DMSO)", DATABASE CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1976:39108, XP002203243 [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * [Y] 1-12
    [] ENDOCR. RES. COMMUN., (1975), vol. 2, no. 4-5, pages 327 - 333,
 [XY]  BHATIA K.S. ET AL., "Percutaneous absorption of LHRH through porcine skin : effect of N-methyl 2-pyrrolidone and isopropyl myristate", DATABASE CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1997:641893, XP002203244 [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * [Y] 1-12
    [] DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHARMACY, (1997), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 1111 - 1114,
International search[Y]US5391381  (WONG PATRICK S L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5545408  (TRIGG TIMOTHY E [AU], et al);
 [Y]US3992365  (BEDDELL CHRISTOPHER RAYMOND, et al);
 [Y]US4411890  (MOMANY FRANK A [US])