blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993529


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.07.2008 Change - representative published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
31.01.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
08.02.2002 (Expected) grant published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
04.12.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
13.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.07.2001 First examination report
09.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
12.04.2001 Renewal fee
19.05.2000 Change - inventor published on  05.07.2000 [2000/27]
25.04.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
22.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
14.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication