Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993529
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3857323BGlobal Dossier 13.12.2006B2
JP2002507260 05.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US9810680 26.05.1998
US5131697 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993529Global Dossier 27.03.2002B1
EP0993529 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9810680 26.05.1998
US5131697 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69804459T 07.11.2002T2
DE69804459D 02.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
US9810680 26.05.1998
US5131697 30.06.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5993139 30.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US4824998 25.03.1998
US5131697 30.06.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9900554Global Dossier 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5131697 30.06.1997