Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993529

EP0993529 - BOX BOOM LIFT ARM ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 Northeast Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENEVE, Jeffrey, A.
3205 Windmere Drive
Sanford, NC 27330 / US
02 / LOUGHRIN, Owen, S.
217 North Gulf Street
Sanford, NC 27330 / US
03 / MCMILLAN, Charles, T.
c/o Caterpillar Inc.;100 NE Adams Street
Peoria, Illinois 61629-6490 / US
[2000/27]
Former [2000/16]01 / DENEVE, Jeffrey, A.
3205 Windmere Drive
Sanford, NC 27330 / US
02 / LOUGHRIN, Owen, S.
217 North Gulf Street
Sanford, NC 27330 / US
03 / MCMILLAN, Charles, T.
404 Valley Road
Sanford, NC 27312 / US
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98923769.826.05.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US10680
Priority number, dateUS19970051316P30.06.1997         Original published format: US 51316 P
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9900554
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993529
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993529
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:E02F3/34, E02F3/38, E02F3/28
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/16]
TitleGerman:KASTENFÖRMIGE HEBEARMANORDNUNG[2000/16]
English:BOX BOOM LIFT ARM ASSEMBLY[2000/16]
French:ENSEMBLE BRAS DE LEVAGE AVEC FLECHE DE TYPE CAISSE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
13.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2001Fee for grant paid
26.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.03.2002
[2008/16]
Cited inInternational search[A]US3589539  (WITWER WALLACE J) [A] 1,12 * figures 3,6-10 *;
 [A]US4034876  (YANCEY JOHN W) [A] 1,2,5,7 * figures 2-8 * * see METHOD OF FABRICATION *;
 [A]JPS5862226  ;
 [A]FR1410683  (KARL SCHAEFF K.G.) [A] 2,12 * figures 8-10 *;
 [A]US4392314  (ALBRECHT ALLAN J ET AL) [A] 4 * column 4, line 46 - line 50 * * figures 5-7 *;
 [AP]EP0791693  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [AP] 1 * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO8102884  (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO ;KNELL H (US)) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US5595471  (AJILORE AKIN O) [A] 1 * figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830705), vol. 007, no. 153, Database accession no. (M - 226), & JP58062226 A 19830413 (KOBE SEIKOSHO KK) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract *