Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970385

EP0970385 - ELECTRICITY METER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.06.2003  [2003/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WINDSHEIMER, Klaus
Stettiner Strasse 2
D-91174 Spalt / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98924010.616.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998DE00772
Priority number, dateDE199711312027.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19713120
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9844355
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970385
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970385
Date:12.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01R21/133
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRIZITÄTSZÄHLER[2000/02]
English:ELECTRICITY METER[2000/02]
French:COMPTEUR ELECTRIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
24.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2002Fee for grant paid
07.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE19526723  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-4,6,8,9 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 31 *;
 [A]EP0420545  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 4, line 8 - line 39 *;
 [DA]DE740487  (SIEMENS AG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *