EP0970553 - OPERATING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SWITCHING OPERATIONS IN A SWITCHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPKE, Volker Obere Büch 12 D-91054 Buckenhof / DE | [2000/02] | Application number, filing date | 98924011.4 | 16.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998DE00773 | Priority number, date | DE1997113119 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19713119 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844610 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970553 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970553 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/26, H02B13/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
H02B13/00 (EP,US);
H02B1/26 (EP,US);
H02H11/008 (EP,US);
H01H2071/006 (EP,US);
H02B15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/02] | Title | German: | BEDIENVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON SCHALTHANDLUNGEN IN EINER SCHALTANLAGE | [2000/02] | English: | OPERATING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SWITCHING OPERATIONS IN A SWITCHING SYSTEM | [2000/02] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE POUR EFFECTUER DES OPERATIONS DE COMMUTATION DANS UNE INSTALLATION DE COMMUTATION | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06195101 ; | [A]JPH03124225 ; | [X]US5233511 (BILAS RONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 14, line 27 - line 40 * * column 14, line 66 - column 15, line 13 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941018), vol. 18, no. 546, Database accession no. (P - 1814), & JP06195101 A 19940715 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910822), vol. 15, no. 330, Database accession no. (E - 1103), & JP03124225 A 19910527 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |