Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969877

EP0969877 - METHODS FOR THE MODULATION OF THE GROWTH OF COLLATERAL ARTERIES AND/OR OTHER ARTERIES FROM PREEXISTING ARTERIOLAR CONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V.
Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAPER, Wolfgang
Am Berg 4
D-61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
02 / ITO, Wulf, D.
Wiesengrund 10
D-21335 Lüneburg / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/02]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98924093.201.04.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01891
Priority number, dateEP1997010564704.04.1997         Original published format: EP 97105647
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844953
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969877
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969877
Date:12.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00, A61K38/19
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG DES WACHSTUMS KOLLATERALER ARTERIEN UND / ODER ANDERER ARTERIEN AUS BESTEHENDEN ARTERIOLEN VERBINDUNGEN[2003/02]
English:METHODS FOR THE MODULATION OF THE GROWTH OF COLLATERAL ARTERIES AND/OR OTHER ARTERIES FROM PREEXISTING ARTERIOLAR CONNECTIONS[2000/02]
French:PROCEDES SERVANT A MODULER LA CROISSANCE D'ARTERES COLLATERALES OU D'AUTRES ARTERES DEPUIS DES BRANCHEMENTS ARTERIOLAIRES PREEXISTANTS[2000/02]
Former [2000/02]VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG DES WACHSTUMS VON KOLLATERALER ARTERIEN UND / ODER ANDERER ARTERIEN AUS BESTEHENDEN ARTERIOLEN VERBINDUNGEN
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
05.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2002Fee for grant paid
15.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02026786.0  / EP1304123
Opposition(s)13.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9626742  (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al);
 [DA]  - WARE ET AL, "ANGIOGENESIS IN ISCHEMIC HEART DISEASE", NATURE MEDICINE, (199702), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 158 - 164, XP002074058

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0297-158
 [DA]  - FRANCI ET AL, "MONOCYTE CHEMOATTRACTANT PROTEIN-3, BUT NOT MONOCYTE CHEMOATTRACTANT PROTEIN-2, IS A FUNCTIONAL LIGAND OF THE HUMAN MONOCYTE CHEMOATTRACTANT PROTEIN-1 RECEPTOR", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 154, pages 6511 - 6517, XP002074059
 [PXA]  - ITO ET AL, "MONOCYTE CHEMOTACTIC PROTEIN-1 INCREASES COLLATERAL AND PERIPHERAL CONDUCTANCE AFTER FEMORAL ARTERY OCCLUSION", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (199706), vol. 80, no. 6, pages 829 - 837, XP002074060 [PX] 1-10,21 * the whole document * [PA] 11-20